Global Patent Index - EP 1236633 A2

EP 1236633 A2 2002-09-04 - Method for a general detection of derailment

Title (en)

Method for a general detection of derailment

Title (de)

Verfahren zur allgemeinen Entgleisungsdetektion

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la détection générale d'un déraillement

Publication

EP 1236633 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02450036 A

Priority

AT 3212001 A

Abstract (en)

The derailing detector for a railway vehicle compares multiple derailment condition values (KEN1-6) with preset values (SOL1-6). On detecting an excessive difference between the sensed values and preset values an indication signal (ALA) and or an emergency brake signal is sent. In the area of the axle bearings (AX1-4) one wheel (RA1-4),and anacceleration signal (S11-14) is produced. Two points on the bogie rotary frame (DGR), a longitudinal acceleration signal is produced. An INDEPENDENT Claim is included for a detector using the method.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren zur Erkennung entgleister Zustände von Rädern eines Schienenfahrzeuges durch Ermittlung zumindest eines für einen Entgleisungszustand charakteristischen Kennwertes (KEN1, KEN2, KEN3, KEN4, KEN5, KEN6), der mit zumindest einem vorgebbaren Sollwert (SOL1, SOL2, SOL3, SOL4, SOL5, SOL6) verglichen wird, wobei bei Überschreiten einer vorgebbaren Abweichung des Kennwertes (KEN1-KEN6) von dem Sollwert (SOL1-SOL6) ein Hinweissignal (ALA) und/oder eine Notbremsung ausgelöst wird, wobei im Bereich einer Achslagerung (AX1, AX2, AX3, AX4) zumindest eines Rades (RA1, RA2, RA3, RA4) zumindest ein Beschleunigungssignal (SI1, SI2, SI3, SI4) erzeugt wird, und/oder an zumindest zwei Punkten eines Drehgestellrahmens (DGR) kontinuierlich die jeweilige Längsbeschleunigung ermittelt und als Längsbeschleunigungssignal (SI5, SI6) erfasst wird und/oder an zumindest einer Radachse ein Drehfrequenzsignal (DFS) erzeugt wird, wobei aus dem zumindest einem, im Bereich einer Achslagerung (AX1, AX2, AX3, AX4) erzeugten Beschleunigungssignal (SI1, SI2, SI3, SI4) und/oder den Längsbeschleunigungssignalen (SI5, SI6) und/oder aus dem zumindest einen Drehfrequenzsignal (DFS) der zumindest eine, für einen Entgleisungszustand charakteristische Kennwert (KEN1, KEN2, KEN3, KEN4, KEN5, KEN6) ermittelt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 9/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236633 A2 20020904; EP 1236633 A3 20030312; AT 413372 B 20060215; AT A3212001 A 20050715

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070116

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060905

2006-07-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS GMBH & CO KG

2003-12-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI