Global Patent Index - EP 1236645 A2

EP 1236645 A2 2002-09-04 - Method and apparatus for closing a container

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for closing a container

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verschliessen eines Behälters

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour clore un récipient

Publication

EP 1236645 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004739 A

Priority

DE 10109632 A

Abstract (en)

The device for sealing a lid (12) on a container (8) using a sealing ring (2) and clamp (6) comprises a carriage (38) which is biased against the lid by a spring (44). A roller (24) is mounted on levers (54, 60) attached to the carriage and can be moved to deform the lower edge of the sealing ring under the rim of the container to seal it. An Independent claim is included for a method for sealing the container using the device.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Verschließen eines mit einem Deckel (12) versehenen Behälters (8) mittels eines Spannringes (2) mit Spannverschluß (6), wobei der Behälter (8) öffnungsseitig einen radial nach außen vorstehenden umlaufenden Rand aufweist, bei dem der Spannring (2) im Querschnitt einen den Rand des Deckels (12) übergreifenden ersten Schenkel, einen den Rand des Deckels (2) und den Rand des Behälters (8) umschließenden zweiten Schenkel und einen über den Rand des Behälters (8) nach unten vorstehenden dritten Schenkel aufweist. Nach dem Spannen des Spannverschlusses (6) wird der Spannring (2) auf den Deckel (12) aufgesetzt, um den dritten Schenkel im Anschluß daran derart zu verformen, daß dieser den Rand des Behälters (8) untergreift. Das Verformen des dritten Schenkels erfolgt mittels verschwenkbarer Rollen (24), die den über den zweiten Schenkel nach unten hinausragenden Spannverschluß (6) berührungslos untergreifen. Weiterhin betrifft die Erfindung ein Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 7/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 7/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 7/285 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2813517 A1 19781207 - MUELLER ERNST AG

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236645 A2 20020904; EP 1236645 A3 20040204; EP 1236645 B1 20041103; AT 281350 T 20041115; DE 10109632 A1 20020919; DE 10109632 B4 20050728; DE 50201423 D1 20041209; DK 1236645 T3 20050124; ES 2227337 T3 20050401; PT 1236645 E 20050131

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50201423

- Representative's name: FRANK OPPERMANN, DE

2012-05-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50201423

- Representative's name: OPPERMANN, FRANK, DIPL.-ING., DE

2012-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50201423

- Representative's name: FRANK OPPERMANN, DE

2012-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50201423

- Representative's name: OPPERMANN, FRANK, DIPL.-ING., DE

2012-05-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50201423

- Representative's name: FRANK OPPERMANN, DE

2012-05-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50201423

- Representative's name: OPPERMANN, FRANK, DIPL.-ING., DE

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2227337 T3

2005-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-01 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-01 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-02-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050203

2005-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050106

2005-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20041117

2005-01-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-01-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201423 P 20041209

2004-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI