Global Patent Index - EP 1236654 A1

EP 1236654 A1 2002-09-04 - Plug for tubular container

Title (en)

Plug for tubular container

Title (de)

Stopfen für rohrförmige Verpackung

Title (fr)

Bouchon pour conditionnement tubulaire

Publication

EP 1236654 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02354037 A

Priority

FR 0102734 A

Abstract (en)

The sealing cap (4) comprises a small collar (41) which is engaged in the tube and fixed there by clips. It has a bottom (42) for sealing the tube which can be removed from the collar by means of a gripping handle (44) and a rupture line (43).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un bouchon (4) d'obturation pour tube de conditionnement d'objets, comprenant une collerette (41) destinée à être engagée dans le tube et à y être fixée par des agrafes (3), et un fond (42) d'obturation du tube, le fond étant désoperculable de la collerette. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 59/02; B65D 59/04; B65D 17/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 17/40 (2006.01); B65D 59/02 (2006.01); B65D 59/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 59/04 (2013.01); B65D 17/4011 (2018.01); B65D 59/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4961511 A 19901009 - PILTZ LARS-ERIK [SE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236654 A1 20020904; FR 2821334 A1 20020830; FR 2821334 B1 20030912; PL 352428 A1 20020909

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090825

2007-10-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070829

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI