Global Patent Index - EP 1236657 A1

EP 1236657 A1 2002-09-04 - Waste collection vehicle

Title (en)

Waste collection vehicle

Title (de)

Müllsammelfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Véhicule de ramassage d'ordures

Publication

EP 1236657 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02251459 A

Priority

GB 0105157 A

Abstract (en)

Waste collection vehicles, of the kind typically used in the collection of municipal waste, may comprise at least one compartment in which waste material is to be transported. It is a problem that in transporting certain kinds of waste material, such as plastics containers or garden or green waste, from a collection point to a recycling point that the ratio of mass transported to volume occupied by the waste material is not particularly high. Embodiments of a municipal waste vehicle are disclosed in which waste material passes through an opening (14;44) in an upper region of a vehicle compartment (8;38) and subsequently through a waste processing unit (4;34), the waste processing unit (4;34) being adapted to reduce the volume of the waste material as the waste material enters the compartment (8;38). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 3/14; B30B 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/3082 (2013.01); B65F 3/14 (2013.01); B65F 2210/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236657 A1 20020904; GB 0105157 D0 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050405

2005-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041122

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRIO DESIGN & ENGINEERING LIMITED

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI