Global Patent Index - EP 1236666 A2

EP 1236666 A2 2002-09-04 - Method and device for treatment of a paper web

Title (en)

Method and device for treatment of a paper web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Behandeln einer Papierbahn

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour le traitement d'une bande

Publication

EP 1236666 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02003782 A

Priority

DE 10110309 A

Abstract (en)

In a paper manufacturing process and assembly a moistened (3) paper web (1) feeds continuously onto a winding spool (7) positioned under a spool-changing lift unit (10). During the terminal feed phase prior to spool change-over, the application of moisture (3) esp. is reduced or suspended.

Abstract (de)

Es wird Verfahren zum Behandeln einer Papierbahn (1) angegeben, bei dem man zunächst Feuchtigkeit auf die Papierbahn (1) aufträgt und die Papierbahn dann auf einen Wickel (7) aufwickelt, wobei man nach dem Aufwickeln einer gewissen Länge der Papierbahn einen Wickelwechsel vornimmt. Ferner wird eine Vorrichtung zum Behandeln einer Papierbahn (1) mit einem Feuchter (3), einer Wickeleinrichtung und einer Wickelwechseleinrichtung (10) angegeben. Dabei möchte man das Risiko von Bahnabrissen bei nachfolgenden Behandlungsvorgängen, die ein Spleißen der Papierbahn erfordern, vermindern. Verfahrensmäßig vermindert man hierzu in einem Zeitraum, der sich zeitlich vor und nach dem Wickelwechsel erstreckt die aufgetragene Feuchtigkeit. Bei der Vorrichtung wirkt die Wickelwechseleinrichtung (10) mit dem Feuchter (3) zusammen und vermindert dessen Feuchtigkeitsabgabe in einem Zeitraum vor und nach einem Wickelwechsel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/10; B65H 18/00; D21G 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/08 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5142 (2013.01); B65H 2511/11 (2013.01); B65H 2511/14 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/11 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2511/14 + B65H 2220/01

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236666 A2 20020904; EP 1236666 A3 20040121; EP 1236666 B1 20070404; DE 10110309 A1 20020919; DE 10110309 C2 20030116; DE 50209851 D1 20070516

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080221

2008-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080220

2008-10-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080107

2007-07-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209851 P 20070516

2007-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 18/10 A

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 18/00 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 21G 7/00 B

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI