Global Patent Index - EP 1236672 A1

EP 1236672 A1 2002-09-04 - Balustrade for escalator or moving walkway

Title (en)

Balustrade for escalator or moving walkway

Title (de)

Balustrade für Fahrtreppe oder Fahrsteig

Title (fr)

Balustrade pour escalier ou trottoir roulant

Publication

EP 1236672 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01124874 A

Priority

DE 20018893 U

Abstract (en)

The moving stairs or pavement has a guide rail(6) installed below the balustrade support base(5), and at least one contact face(7) for gliding or rolling element(1) is provided between the guide rail and balustrade support base. The guide rail and contact face are installed via a connecting element(4) in force transmitting contact on the balustrade support base. One contact face is constructed for side contact on the slide or rolling element.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Fahrtreppe oder einem Fahrsteig mit einem sich zwischen Balustradensockeln erstreckenden Stufen- oder Palettenband, bei denen die Stufen oder Paletten über Gleit- oder Rollelemente in einer zur Laufrichtung des Stufen- oder Palettenbandes im wesentlichen parallel ausgerichteten Führungsschiene geführt sind, ist es vorgesehen, daß die Führungsschiene (6) unterhalb des Balustradensockels (5) angeordnet ist und zwischen Führungsschiene (6) und Balustradensockel (5) wenigstens eine Kontaktfläche (7) für die Gleit- und Rollelemente (1) vorgesehen ist. Die Führungsschiene und die wenigstens eine Kontaktfläche (7) sind über ein Verbindungselement (4) in kraftübertragender Anlage an dem Balustradensockel (5) angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 23/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/14 (2006.01); B66B 23/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/225 (2013.01); B66B 23/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 20018893 U1 20010517; AT 284835 T 20050115; CZ 20013996 A3 20020814; CZ 293941 B6 20040818; EP 1236672 A1 20020904; EP 1236672 B1 20041215

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071018

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2006-10-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061023

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-10-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061005

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-02-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-07-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041215

2005-03-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050326

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104832 P 20050120

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-01-08 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20021026

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021028

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI