Global Patent Index - EP 1236793 A2

EP 1236793 A2 2002-09-04 - Washing agent and laundry treatment agent comprising one or more dye transfer inhibiting dye fixatives

Title (en)

Washing agent and laundry treatment agent comprising one or more dye transfer inhibiting dye fixatives

Title (de)

Waschmittel und Wäschebehandlungsmittel enthaltend ein oder mehrere farbübertragungsinhibierende Farbfixiermittel

Title (fr)

Compositions pour lavage et pour traitement de linge comprenant un ou de plus inhibiteurs de transfer de colorant

Publication

EP 1236793 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004064 A

Priority

  • DE 10110338 A
  • DE 10150724 A
  • US 8571202 A

Abstract (en)

Washing agents contain transfer-inhibiting dye fixing agents. Washing agents contain transfer-inhibiting dye fixing agents obtained by reaction of: (i) polyamines with cyanamides and amidosulfuric acid; (ii) cyanamides with aldehydes and ammonium salts; or (iii) amines with epichlorhydrin.

Abstract (de)

In Waschmitteln werden folgende farbübertragungsinhibierende Farbfixiermittel eingesetzt: Umsetzungsprodukte aus a) Polyaminen mit Cyanamiden und Amidoschwefelsäure oder, b) Cyanamiden mit Aldehyden und Ammoniumsalzen oder, c) Aminen mit Epichlorhydrin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/30; C11D 3/32; C11D 3/37; C11D 3/34; C11D 3/20; C11D 1/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 1/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/04 (2006.01); C11D 3/30 (2006.01); C11D 3/32 (2006.01); C11D 3/34 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); D06L 4/75 (2017.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/39 (2013.01); C11D 3/0021 (2013.01); C11D 3/0036 (2013.01); C11D 3/3723 (2013.01); C11D 3/38645 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236793 A2 20020904; EP 1236793 A3 20030903; EP 1236793 B1 20071114; AT 378392 T 20071115; DE 10150724 A1 20030417; DE 50211176 D1 20071227; ES 2294053 T3 20080401; JP 2002338995 A 20021127; JP 4315634 B2 20090819; PT 1236793 E 20080212; US 2003171249 A1 20030911; US 6858570 B2 20050222

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161207

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-09-13 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: PATENT MANAGEMENT INDUSTRIEPARK HOECHST / G 860, 65926 FRANKFURT AM MAIN (DE)

2013-01-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100223

2011-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100823

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100223

2010-08-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100823

2009-08-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080815

2008-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2294053 T3

2008-02-29 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080400073

2008-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080204

2008-02-12 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080130

2007-12-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211176 P 20071227

2007-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT TR

2007-11-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-10-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT TR

2007-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LANG, FRANK-PETER, DI.

2007-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERENBOLD, HELMUT, DR.

2007-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WESSLING, MICHAEL, DR.

2007-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

2004-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040303

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/37 A

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI