Global Patent Index - EP 1236808 A2

EP 1236808 A2 2002-09-04 - Process of preparation of a composite material made from metal powder

Title (en)

Process of preparation of a composite material made from metal powder

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Metallpulver-Verbundwerkstoffs

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation d'un matériau composite à partir de poudre métallique

Publication

EP 1236808 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01130567 A

Priority

DE 10110341 A

Abstract (en)

Metal powder composite material contains at least two oxides enclosing metal powder particles. The oxides form a common phase. An Independent claim is also included for a process for the production of a composite material comprising pressing a starting material into molded bodies, pyrolyzing the separating agent by heating in a non-reducing atmosphere to oxides, and reacting the oxides with each other forming a common phase. Preferred Features: The metal powder is made from iron. The common phase is a silicate- or boron-containing glass or a defined compound selected from mixed oxides with a spinal structure, metal phosphates and metal silicates. The mixed oxides are selected from Al2MgO4, Al2ZnO4, Al2MnO4, Al2FeO4, Fe2MgO4, Fe3O4, Fe2ZnO4, Fe2MnO4, Fe2NiO4, Cr2FeO4 and Cr2MgO4.

Abstract (de)

Um einen Metallpulver-Verbundwerkstoff mit hohem spezifischem elektrischem Widerstand mit guter mechanischer Festigkeit, sehr guter Temperatur- und Kraftstoffbeständigkeit und ein Ausgangsmaterial und ein Verfahren für die rationelle Herstellung eines solchen Verbundwerkstoffs anzugeben, wird ein Metallpulver-Verbundwerkstoff mit hohem spezifischem elektrischem Widerstand, welcher mindestens zwei die Metallpulverteilchen einhüllenden Oxide enthält, wobei die Oxide mindestens eine gemeinsame Phase bilden, und ein Metallpulver enthaltendes Ausgangsmaterial, welches mindestens zwei Trennmitttel mit oxidischem Pyrolyserückstand oder mindestens ein Trennmittel mit oxidischem Pyrolyserückstand und oxidisches Feinpulver beinhaltet, und ein Verfahren für die Herstellung eines solchen Verbundwerkstoffs bereitgestellt, bei dem von einem Ausgangsmaterial der genannten Art ausgegangen wird, bei dem das Ausgangsmaterial zu Formkörpern gepreßt wird, bei dem die Trennmittel durch Erhitzen in einer nicht reduzierenden Atmosphäre zu Oxiden pyrolysiert und die dann vorliegenden Oxide unter Bildung mindestens einer gemeinsamen Phase miteinander zur Reaktion gebracht werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 1/10; B22F 1/02; C22C 33/02; H01F 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 1/02 (2006.01); C22C 33/02 (2006.01); H01F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 33/0228 (2013.01); B22F 1/02 (2013.01); H01F 1/24 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2991 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2993 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236808 A2 20020904; EP 1236808 A3 20050727; EP 1236808 B1 20090819; DE 10110341 A1 20021031; DE 20122873 U1 20081030; DE 50115053 D1 20091001; EP 2053138 A1 20090429; US 2002122942 A1 20020905; US 6756118 B2 20040629

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161221

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170701

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170102

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161221

2017-09-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170831

2017-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161221

2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50115053

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100520

2009-10-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50115053 P 20091001

2009-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-08-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-03-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS OF PREPARATION OF A COMPOSITE MATERIAL MADE FROM METAL POWDER

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060914

2006-04-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060127

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-07-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-07-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 1/10 A

2005-07-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22F 1/02 B

2005-07-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 33/02 B

2005-07-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01F 1/24 B

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI