Global Patent Index - EP 1236810 A1

EP 1236810 A1 2002-09-04 - Process and apparatus for the partial thermochemical treatment of metallic workpieces

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for the partial thermochemical treatment of metallic workpieces

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur partiellen thermochemischen Vakuumbehandlung von metallischen Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour le traitement thermochimique partiel de pièces métalliques

Publication

EP 1236810 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02004013 A

Priority

DE 10109565 A

Abstract (en)

Process for partially vacuum treating metallic workpieces comprises simultaneously treating several workpieces (1) with defined hollow chambers (2) in a molded body (11) and allowing a carbon-containing atmosphere to enter the hollow chambers of the workpiece. No thermo-chemical treatment takes place on the external surfaces of the workpiece. An Independent claim is also included for a device for carrying out the partial vacuum treatment of metallic workpieces. Preferred Features: At least one surface region of the hollow chamber of the workpiece is shielded against thermo-chemical treatment using a sleeve (8) whilst a further surface region of the hollow chamber is subjected to thermo-chemical treatment. The thermo-chemical treatment can be carried out using a plasma.

Abstract (de)

Beim partiellen thermochemischen Vakuumbehandeln von metallischen Werkstücken (1), insbesondere beim Aufkohlen und Einsatzhärten von Werkstücken (1) aus Einsatzstahl in einer kohlenstoffhaltigen Atmosphäre, stoßen zu behandelnde Oberflächenbereiche (3, 4, 5, 6) und nicht zu behandelnde Oberflächenbereiche aneinander. Um die Oberflächenbehandlung auf die Hohlräume (2) der Werkstücke (1) zu beschränken, werden die nicht zu behandelnden äußeren Oberflächenbereiche durch wiederverwendbare zerlegbare Formkörper (11) aus einem temperaturbeständigen Material mit mindestens einem Formhohlraum (15) abgedeckt. Dabei schließt der aus einem Unterteil (12) und einem Oberteil (13) mit Öffnungen (12b, 13b) bestehende Formkörper (11) mehrere. Werkstücke (1) derart ein, daß auf den äußeren Oberflächenbereichen der werkstücke (1) keine Behandlung stattfindet. Ein elektrisch leitfähiger Formkörper (11) eignet sich insbesondere für eine thermochemische Behandlung unter Plasmaeinwirkung. Als Material für die Formkörper (11) wird Grafit oder CFC verwendet. In einem solchen Formkörper können die Werkstücke sowohl vor der Aufkohlung einem Aufheizvorgang als auch nach der Aufkohlung Vorgängen aus der Gruppe Diffusion, Gasabschrekkung und ggf. Weiterbehandlungen wie Tiefkühlung und/oder Anlassen ausgesetzt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 8/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236810 A1 20020904; EP 1236810 A8 20030102; DE 10109565 A1 20020912; DE 10109565 B4 20051020; US 2003047241 A1 20030313; US 6776854 B2 20040817

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150307

2009-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091027

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030212

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI