Global Patent Index - EP 1236813 A2

EP 1236813 A2 2002-09-04 - Members coated with composite oxide coatings for preventing the permeation of hydrogen isotopes and a process for producing such members

Title (en)

Members coated with composite oxide coatings for preventing the permeation of hydrogen isotopes and a process for producing such members

Title (de)

Elemente beschichtet mit wasserstoffundurchlässigen Oxidverbundschichten und Verfahren zur Herstellung von solchen Elementen

Title (fr)

Eléments revêtus de couches d'oxydes composites imperméables à l'hydrogène et procédé de fabrication de ces éléments

Publication

EP 1236813 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02090080 A

Priority

JP 2001058253 A

Abstract (en)

The surface of a chemical densified coating formed on the surface of a stainless steel substrate is coated or sprayed with an aqueous solution based on chromic acid and a material capable of forming an amorphous inorganic substance upon sintering or the chemical densified coating is dipped in the aqueous solution and recovered; the chemical densified coating is then sintered by heating at 250 - 750 DEG C so that the pores and cracks in the chemical densified coating are filled with the fine particles of a composite of chromium oxide and an amorphous inorganic material and that the surface of the chemical densified coating is covered with a layer of such fine particles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 28/04; C23C 4/18; C23C 20/00; C23C 30/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/24 (2006.01); C23C 18/12 (2006.01); C23C 20/00 (2006.01); C23C 22/82 (2006.01); C23C 26/00 (2006.01); C23C 28/04 (2006.01); C23C 30/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 30/00 (2013.01); C23C 18/1216 (2013.01); C23C 18/1241 (2013.01); C23C 26/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236813 A2 20020904; EP 1236813 A3 20030813; EP 1236813 B1 20110525; JP 2002256450 A 20020911; JP 4863181 B2 20120125

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60240113

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-21 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60240113

- Effective date: 20120228

2012-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120228

2011-07-07 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60240113

- Effective date: 20110707

2011-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2010-07-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JAPAN ATOMIC ENERGY AGENCY

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040205

2004-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031124

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 28/04 A

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 4/18 B

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 04B 41/52 B

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 30/00 B

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 20/00 B

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI