Global Patent Index - EP 1236816 A1

EP 1236816 A1 2002-09-04 - Process for dezincing galvanized steel

Title (en)

Process for dezincing galvanized steel

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Entzinken galvanisierten Stahls

Title (fr)

Procédé de dézingage de l'acier galvanisé

Publication

EP 1236816 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02075407 A

Priority

EP 98918703 A

Abstract (en)

A process for removing zinc from galvanized steel. The galvanized steel is immersed in an electrolyte containing at least about 15% by weight of sodium or potassium hydroxide and having a temperature of at least about 75 DEG C and the zinc is galvanically corroded from the surface of the galvanized steel. The material serving as the cathode is principally a material having a standard electrode potential which is immediate of the standard electrode potentials of zinc and cadmium in the electrochemical series. The corrosion rate may be accelerated by increasing the number density of corrosion sites in the galvanized steel by mechanically abrading or deforming the galvanized steel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25F 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236816 A1 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021115

2002-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MORGAN, WILLIAM A

2002-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUDEK, FREDERICK J.

2002-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DANIELS, EDWARD J. METALS INVESTMENT TRUST LTD.

2002-09-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 996775

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL