Global Patent Index - EP 1236818 A1

EP 1236818 A1 2002-09-04 - Process and device for producing isotropic non-wovens

Title (en)

Process and device for producing isotropic non-wovens

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung isotroper Vliesstoffe

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour produire des non-tissés isotropes

Publication

EP 1236818 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02003777 A

Priority

DE 10109476 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10109476C1] To produce a nonwoven fabric, as the web is formed, doffers take off separate part-webs with identical material compositions, where one (2) is taken off at a higher speed than the other (5). (2) is folded in a zigzag into a new part-web (1) with lateral fibers, in a width matching the slower part-web, and laid on it at its movement speed and across its fiber (3) orientation, to form a compound web (4) to be bonded. To produce a nonwoven material, the faster part-web is deflected to give it a zigzag structure. As it is converted into the zigzag, it is laid on the slower web and at its speed of travel. The faster web can be immediately shaped into a zigzag, and then deflected parallel to or across the working direction of the card, to be deflected into the path of the slower part-web. The zigzag part-layers, within the lateral fiber part-web, are laid at an angle where its sine is a true fraction of 1 \/ n where n is a whole number <= 7 e.g. 30.0 deg (sine \2), 19.5 deg (sine 1 \/ 3), 14.5 deg (sine \4), or 11.5 deg (sine 1 \/ 5). The speed of the faster part-web as taken from the card is a whole-number multiple of the speed of the slower part-web and preferably twice, three times, four times or five times as fast. The fiber mass in the faster part-web is equal to that in the slower part-web with a permissible tolerance of \! 20 wt.%. The faster part-web is taken from the card by a lower doffer, and the slower part-web is taken off by an upper doffer. Or three doffers can be used, to take identical part-webs, with the faster part-web in the center. An Independent claim is included for an assembly to produce a nonwoven, where part-webs are taken from the card at different speeds. The faster part-web is shaped into lateral zigzags, to be bonded to the slower part-web.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Anlage zum Herstellen eines Vliesstoffes. Um einen bezüglich der Längs- und der Querrichtung weitgehend isotropen Vliesstoff kostengünstig herstellen zu können, wird erfindungsgemäß ein zweilagiges Vlies (4) aus einer einzigen Vliesbildungseinrichtung (10) hergestellt, wobei das eine Teilvlies (5) überwiegend längs orientierte Fasern und das andere, zick-zack-förmig gelegte Teilvlies - Querfaser-Teilvlies (1) - überwiegend quer orientierte Fasern enthält. Der Primärflor für das Querfaser-Teilvlies wird mit mehrfach höherer Geschwindigkeit aus dem Vliesbildungsprozeß abgenommen, als der Flor des anderen, langsameren Teilvlieses. Beide Teilvliese werden so zueinander umgelenkt und ausgerichtet, daß sie zu einem zweilagigen Vollvlies (4) vereinigt werden können. Diese doppellagige, auf kostengünstige Weise hergestellte Vliesvorlage wird dann zu einem weitgehend isotropen Vliesstoff verfestigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 25/00; D04H 1/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 25/00 (2006.01); D04H 1/52 (2006.01); D04H 1/72 (2012.01); D04H 1/74 (2006.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/52 (2013.01); D01G 25/00 (2013.01); D04H 1/72 (2013.01); D04H 1/74 (2013.01); D04H 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10109476 C1 20020627; AT 293712 T 20050515; EP 1236818 A1 20020904; EP 1236818 B1 20050420; ES 2236373 T3 20050716; PL 352500 A1 20020909; US 2002116793 A1 20020829

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AUTEFA SOLUTIONS GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHMIDT, GUNTER F., 79312 EMMENDINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 50202821

- Effective date: 20120416

2012-06-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50202821

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

- Effective date: 20120416

2012-06-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50202821

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

- Effective date: 20120327

2012-04-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50202821

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

2012-03-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50202821

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

2012-02-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GUNTER F. SCHMIDT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KARL MAYER MALIMO TEXTILMASCHINENFABRIK GMBH, 09117 CHEMNITZ, DE

- Document: DE 50202821

- Effective date: 20111220

2012-02-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AUTEFA SOLUTIONS GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KARL MAYER MALIMO TEXTILMASCHINENFABRIK GMBH, 09117 CHEMNITZ, DE

- Document: DE 50202821

- Effective date: 20111220

2012-02-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50202821

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

- Effective date: 20111220

2011-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50202821

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSSOZIETAET MAUCHER, BO, DE

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090221

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090220

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090221

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090220

2009-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KARL *MAYER MALIMO TEXTILMASCHINENFABRIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050420

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050420

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-02-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070208

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060123

2006-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060220

2005-11-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-09-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050920

2005-08-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050718

2005-07-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-07-20 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-07-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2236373 T3

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202821 P 20050525

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-04-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050420

2005-04-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050420

2005-04-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050420

2003-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KARL MAYER MALIMO TEXTILMASCHINENFABRIK GMBH

2003-12-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KARL MAYER MALIMO TEXTILMASCHINENFABRIK GMBH

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030220

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI