Global Patent Index - EP 1236823 A2

EP 1236823 A2 2002-09-04 - Method for wet treatment of laundry

Title (en)

Method for wet treatment of laundry

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Nassbehandlung von Wäschestücken

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le traitement au mouillé du linge

Publication

EP 1236823 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02000840 A

Priority

DE 10109749 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6681429B2] A method to treat laundry items in the last treatment zone of a tunnel washing machine with a liquid that has a higher temperature than the liquid of the preceding zone, resulting in the liquid of the bound liquor having a higher temperature and making it possible to remove a greater portion of the bound liquor form the laundry items in a hydroextraction press, so that the laundry items leaving the hydroextraction press have only a slight residual moisture which is still has to be removed by drying, thus shortening the drying process and requiring less energy.

Abstract (de)

Die in Durchlaufwaschmaschinen (10) gewaschen und gegebenenfalls nachbehandelten Wäschestücke werden nach dem Verlassen der Durchlaufwaschmaschine (10) in einer Entwässerungspresse (21) von einem Teil der an den Wäschestücken anhaftenden Flüssigkeit (gebundene Flotte) befreit. Der in den Wäschestücken verbleibende Teil der gebundenen Flotte wird durch anschließendes Trocknen entfernt. Dieses Trocknen ist zeit- und energieaufwendig. Die Erfindung sieht vor, die Wäschestücke in einer letzten Behandlungszone der Durchlaufwaschmaschine (10) mit einer Flüssigkeit zu behandeln, die eine höhere Temperatur gegenüber der Flüssigkeit der vorhergehenden Behandlungszone aufweist. Dadurch verfügt die Flüssigkeit der gebundenen Flotte über eine höhere Temperatur. Diese ermöglicht es, einen größeren Teil der gebundenen Flotte in der Entwässerungspresse (21) aus den Wäschestücken zu entfernen, so dass diese nach dem Verlassen der Entwässerungspresse (21) nur noch eine geringe Restfeuchte aufweisen und nur diese durch anschließendes Trocknen noch beseitigt werden muss. Dadurch wird der Trocknungsvorgang kürzer und benötigt vor allem weniger Energie. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 31/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236823 A2 20020904; EP 1236823 A3 20030115; EP 1236823 B1 20060503; DE 10109749 A1 20020905; DE 50206612 D1 20060608; US 2002116770 A1 20020829; US 6681429 B2 20040127

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-05-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERBERT KANNEGIESSER GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PHARMAGG SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH, 27318 HOYA, DE

- Document: DE 50206612

- Effective date: 20130405

2013-05-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50206612

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20130405

2013-05-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50206612

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20130405

2013-04-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50206612

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120115

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110115

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110115

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100113

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100208

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2007-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206612 P 20060608

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-05-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031024

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 06F 31/00 A, 7D 06F 35/00 B, 7D 06F 39/00 B

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI