Global Patent Index - EP 1236824 A1

EP 1236824 A1 2002-09-04 - Drum type washing machine

Title (en)

Drum type washing machine

Title (de)

Trommelwaschmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à lessive du type à tambour

Publication

EP 1236824 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02250196 A

Priority

  • JP 2001004922 A
  • JP 2001048733 A

Abstract (en)

A washing machine includes a water tub (8), a rotating tub (10) rotatably mounted in the water tub (8) so that laundry is put into the rotating tub (10), a water supply unit (53) for supplying water into the water tub (8), and a foam detector (37, 46, 47) for detecting foam produced in the rotating tub (10). The washing machine may further include a determining unit (92) for determining whether an amount of foam produced in the rotating tub (10) is abnormal, on the basis of a result of detection by the foam detector (37, 46, 47) and a foam restricting unit (92) for restricting the amount of foam produced in the rotating tub (10) when the determining unit (92) has determined that the amount of foam produced in the rotating tub (10) is abnormal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 33/02 (2006.01); D06F 39/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236824 A1 20020904; EP 1236824 B1 20040818; CN 1229536 C 20051130; CN 1369592 A 20020918; DE 60200959 D1 20040923; DE 60200959 T2 20050818; KR 100443817 B1 20040809; KR 20020060930 A 20020719; TW 554115 B 20030921

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140111

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140111

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60200959

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140111

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60200959

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130109

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130109

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130204

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120118

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-11 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20070317

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60200959 P 20040923

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SAITO, TATSUYA

2004-06-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SASANO, KIYOMI

2004-06-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HIRANO, TAKAYUKI

2004-06-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NISHIWAKI, SATORU

2004-06-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ASANUMA, KATSUHIKO

2004-06-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHIMAKAGE, KATSUYUKI

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020204

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI