Global Patent Index - EP 1236830 A1

EP 1236830 A1 2002-09-04 - Creped and embossed absorbent paper, embossing cylinder and process

Title (en)

Creped and embossed absorbent paper, embossing cylinder and process

Title (de)

Gekrepptes und geprägtes, saugfähiges Papier, Prägezylinder und Prägeverfahren

Title (fr)

Feuille de papier absorbant crêpée et gaufrée, cylindre de gaufrage d'une telle feuille et procédé de gaufrage

Publication

EP 1236830 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01400477 A

Priority

EP 01400477 A

Abstract (en)

The embossed absorbent paper is made from at least two layers (12, 14) of creped cellulose wadding with a weight of between 12 and 30 g/sq m. Each layer has two embossed patterns with truncated conical protuberances - one with large protuberances (18) with summits (32) extending as far as the inner surface (24) of the opposite layer, and the other with smaller protuberances (38, 40) with summits (42, 44) that meet in the middle between the layers but are not linked. The larger protuberances are in a pattern of concentric rings, while the smaller ones fill the spaces between them. The layers of the paper are formed between pairs of rollers with projecting studs and then assembled.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une feuille gaufrée (10) composée d'au moins un premier et un deuxième plis (12,14) d'ouate de cellulose crêpée du type dont au moins un premier pli (12) comporte un premier motif (16) de gaufrage constitué d'une première série de premières protubérances (18) qui forment notamment des premiers alignements et dont les sommets (32) sont liés à la face interne (24) du deuxième pli (14) en vis-à-vis, caractérisée en ce que ces deux plis (12,14) comportent chacun un deuxième motif (36) de gaufrage constitué d'une deuxième série de deuxièmes protubérances (38,40), et en ce que des sommets (42,44) des deuxièmes protubérances (38,40) d'un pli (12,14) s'étendent en vis-à-vis et à proximité de sommets (44,42) des deuxièmes protubérances (40,38) de l'autre pli (14,12). L'invention concerne aussi une paire de cylindres gravés (26) pour le gaufrage, ainsi qu'un procédé de fabrication d'une feuille gaufrée. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 27/40; B31F 1/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2006.01); D21H 27/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2013.01); D21H 27/40 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0733 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0738 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0761 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0764 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0766 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236830 A1 20020904; EP 1236830 B1 20070411; AT 359396 T 20070515; CA 2406577 A1 20020906; CA 2406577 C 20100112; DE 60127806 D1 20070524; DE 60127806 T2 20071227; DK 1236830 T3 20070820; ES 2284600 T3 20071116; NO 20025046 A 20021220; NO 20025046 D0 20021021; NO 332242 B1 20120806; PT 1236830 E 20070718; WO 02068758 A1 20020906

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180301

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20070402006

- Effective date: 20160905

2017-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160823

2016-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160905

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-09-26 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150209

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150126

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080223

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070411

2008-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080114

2007-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2284600 T3

2007-08-20 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2007-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE SA

2007-07-23 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070402006

2007-07-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070621

2007-07-18 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20070706

2007-07-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60127806 P 20070524

2007-05-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2007-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-04-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI