Global Patent Index - EP 1236841 A2

EP 1236841 A2 2002-09-04 - Flat roof and inspection device for flat roof

Title (en)

Flat roof and inspection device for flat roof

Title (de)

Flachdach und Inspektions-vorrichtung für ein Flachdach

Title (fr)

Toit plat et dispositif d'inspection pour toit plat

Publication

EP 1236841 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01810615 A

Priority

CH 3842001 A

Abstract (en)

Flat roof comprises an insulating layer (3) arranged on a vapor seal (2) arranged on a base (1). At least one inspection device (4) passing through the insulating layer and having a visible inner chamber (5) extends down to the vapor seal and is connected to an outer side via at least one inlet opening (6) so that water penetrating the insulating layer collects in the inner chamber. An Independent claim is also included for an inspection device for a flat roof. Preferred Features: The inspection device has an inspection tube (7) having a lower end with the inlet opening. The lower end has an outward-protruding collar (15) connected in a water-tight manner to the vapor seal.

Abstract (de)

Das Flachdach weist wenigstens eine Inspektionsvorrichtung (4) auf, welche in eine Isolationsschicht (3) eingreift und einen einsehbaren Innenraum (5) aufweist, der sich im wesentlichen bis zur Dampfsperre (2) erstreckt. Der Innenraum (5) ist über wenigstens eine Eintrittsöffnung (6) mit einer Aussenseite verbunden, derart, dass in die Isolationsschicht (3) eingedrungenes Wasser sich in diesem Innenraum (5) sammelt. Durch einfache visuelle Kontrollen kann eine Wasserundichtigkeit frühzeitig erkannt werden und es lassen sich grössere Wasserschäden vermeiden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236841 A2 20020904; EP 1236841 A3 20030129

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-11-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI