Global Patent Index - EP 1236842 A1

EP 1236842 A1 2002-09-04 - Anchoring device for scaffolds or stages

Title (en)

Anchoring device for scaffolds or stages

Title (de)

Verankerungsvorrichtung für Gerüst oder Bühne

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'ancrage pour échaffaudage ou estrade

Publication

EP 1236842 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01830792 A

Priority

IT FI20010011 U

Abstract (en)

Anchoring device for scaffolds or stages, especially of the type used in the construction and maintenance of buildings and building products in general, for anchoring scaffolds or stages (P) to a wall (PA) of the building or product, characterized in that it comprises a rod (1) provided with means for connection to the scaffold (P) to be anchored and means for attachment to the anchoring wall (PA), the said attachment means being able to slide longitudinally on the body of the rod (1) and be locked thereon in relation to the distance between the scaffold (P) and the wall (PA). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 5/04 (2013.01); E04G 5/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236842 A1 20020904; IT FI20010011 U1 20020805

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040621

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI