Global Patent Index - EP 1236843 A2

EP 1236843 A2 2002-09-04 - System, method and modular forms for the production of floors

Title (en)

System, method and modular forms for the production of floors

Title (de)

System, Verfahren und modulare Körper zur Herstellung von Böden

Title (fr)

Système, méthode et formes modulaires pour la production des planchers

Publication

EP 1236843 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01129435 A

Priority

IT TO20001159 A

Abstract (en)

This invention describes a system and a method for the production of floors, based on the use of modular forms (1, 2), in order to form a structure that can contain a concrete cast (5); on the resulting structure there are lightening cavities and seats (D) for suitable reinforcing elements (3), the above-cited seats forming load-bearing ribs or beams, after the positioning of the above-mentioned reinforcing elements (3), the casting of the concrete (5) and its subsequent consolidation. <??>The invention enables to produce floors in reinforced concrete, with parallel unidirectional load-bearing ribs or lacunar elements with load-bearing crossed ribs, suited to comply with the static requirements of all floors of both civil and industrial buildings, in brick or reinforced concrete, and in particular for anti-seismic buildings. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 11/40; E04B 5/32; E04G 11/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/32 (2006.01); E04B 5/48 (2006.01); E04G 11/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 11/40 (2013.01); E04B 5/21 (2013.01); E04B 5/326 (2013.01); E04B 5/48 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236843 A2 20020904; EP 1236843 A3 20040114; IT 1320747 B1 20031210; IT TO20001159 A1 20020613; IT TO20001159 D0 20001213

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-11-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04G 11/40 A

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04B 5/32 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04G 11/46 B

2004-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CRISTALLI, NICOLA

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI