Global Patent Index - EP 1236848 A2

EP 1236848 A2 2002-09-04 - Entombment assembly and method for family tomb crypts

Title (en)

Entombment assembly and method for family tomb crypts

Title (de)

Bestattungsanordnung und Methode für Familiengruften

Title (fr)

Ensemble funéraire et méthode pour Cryptes familiales

Publication

EP 1236848 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02425230 A

Priority

IT RM20010207 A

Abstract (en)

Assembly (1) and method thereof to simplify the making of a family tomb crypt, comprising a plurality of entombment structures (2), each having housing means (4) apt to receive at least one coffin (B), said structures being apt to be stacked the one on the other so as to define a plurality of coffin entombment compartments (9) located at different levels, said plurality comprising at least one entombment structure apt to form, in correspondence of a respective level of the stacked configuration, one port (20) to enable the passage of a coffin (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 13/00 (2006.01); A61G 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 13/00 (2013.01); A61G 19/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236848 A2 20020904; EP 1236848 A3 20021009; IT RM20010207 A1 20021017; IT RM20010207 D0 20010417

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030826

2003-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030205

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI