Global Patent Index - EP 1236851 A2

EP 1236851 A2 2002-09-04 - Locking/grip device for a gate; in particualr a garage gate, or a door

Title (en)

Locking/grip device for a gate; in particualr a garage gate, or a door

Title (de)

Verriegelungs-/Griffvorrichtung für ein Tor, insbesondere ein Garagentor, oder eine Tür

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage/poignée pour vantail de portail, en particulier porte de garage, ou une porte

Publication

EP 1236851 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004545 A

Priority

DE 10109533 A

Abstract (en)

The lock and garage assembly for a garage door has manual or power operation. The lock operation in either mode is through a sliding plate (12) which is moved and transfers the movement to the lock. The slide can be in two parts, with the actuator drive operating on one part of the slide (24), which the rounded locking projection can move through.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Verriegelungs-/Griffvorrichtung für ein Tor, insbesondere ein Garagentor, oder eine Tür, mit welchem Verriegelungselemente für das Tor blockierbar, freigebbar und antreibbar sind, um das Tor aus einem Verriegelungszustand in einen Entriegelungszustand und wieder zurück zu überführen, wobei die Verriegelungs/Griffvorrichtung (2) sowohl manuell als auch über einen insbesondere motorischen Stellantrieb ver- und entriegelbar und damit betätigbar ist, und wobei sowohl die manuellen als auch die über den Stellantrieb erfolgenden Ver- und Entriegelungsvorgänge auf eine in der Verriegelungs/Griffvorrichtung (2) verschiebbare Kulissenanordung (12) wirken, welche die Betätigungsbewegungen in entsprechende Ver- und Entriegelungsbewegungen der Verriegelungselemente umsetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/04; E05B 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/04 (2006.01); E05B 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/042 (2013.01); E05B 47/02 (2013.01); E05B 65/0021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236851 A2 20020904; EP 1236851 A3 20040714; DE 10109533 A1 20020912; DE 10109533 C2 20030626

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050115

2005-05-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-04-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI