Global Patent Index - EP 1236856 A1

EP 1236856 A1 2002-09-04 - "Door case"

Title (en)

"Door case"

Title (de)

Türzarge

Title (fr)

Chassis de porte

Publication

EP 1236856 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02075790 A

Priority

BE 200100140 A

Abstract (en)

Door case, of the type whereby the actual door case (2) consists of two stiles (5-6) which are connected to each other at the top by means of a top part (12), and on the one side, the other side, respectively, of this actual door case (2), a door framework (3-4), whereby said door framework (3-4) is adjustable in respect to the actual door case (2), depending on the thickness of the wall, in that in the lateral edges (8-9) of the actual door case (2), grooves (10-11) are provided with which ribs (15-16-17-18-20-21) of the door frameworks (3-4) can cooperate, characterized in that in the four upper corners of the actual door case (2), recesses are provided with a depth (D) equal to the thickness of a stile (5-6), diminished by the thickness (D2) of a stile (5-6), this thickness (D2) being equal to the thickness of the stile part situated between said grooves (10-11) and the inner wall of a door case stile (5-6) or top part (12), and with a width (D3-D4) which respectively is equal to the depth of the respective grooves (10-11), whereas the ribs (15) to (18) of the door framework (3-4) come together in the upper corner of this latter and end at the location where they meet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] US 5974745 A 19991102 - BARR GERALD L [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236856 A1 20020904; BE 1013989 A3 20030114

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040114

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021202

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI