Global Patent Index - EP 1236857 A1

EP 1236857 A1 2002-09-04 - Method for the fabrication of frames for windows and/or doors and a covering profile which is employed in this method

Title (en)

Method for the fabrication of frames for windows and/or doors and a covering profile which is employed in this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Rahmen für Fenster und/oder Türen und ein Abdeckprofilabschitt der zum Einsatz bei diesem Verfahren kommt

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication des châssis pour fenêtres et/ou portes et un profil de couverture pour ledit procédé

Publication

EP 1236857 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01116885 A

Priority

  • DE 10107003 A
  • DE 10120876 A

Abstract (en)

Frame for windows and/or doors comprises horizontal and vertical frame parts (22, 23, 24, 25) made of wood and covering profile sections (21) made of plastic, ceramic, glass, natural stone, wood or metal in a thin sheet thickness. The covering profile sections are placed on the frame parts without additional fixing devices. An Independent claim is also included for a process for manufacturing the above frame. Preferred Features: The covering profile sections made of metal are turned over, rolled or pressed.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf einen Rahmen für Fenster und/oder Türen, der aus horizontalen und vertikalen Rahmenprofilen aus Holz besteht, wobei diese Rahmenteile nach außen hin durch Abdeckprofile aus Kunststoff, Glas, Keramik, Holz, Naturstein oder Metall abgedeckt sind, wobei, wenn Abdeckprofile aus Metall eingesetzt werden, diese Feinblech-Materialstärke aufweisen. Weiterhin bezieht sich die Erfindung auf ein Verfahren zur Herstellung solcher Rahmen, wobei die einzelnen Rahmenprofile als Halbfabrikate aus Holz hergestellt werden und anschließend vor der Rahmenherstellung Abdeckprofile aufgebracht werden, die aus Kunststoff, Metall, Glas, Keramik, Naturstein oder Holz bestehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/30 (2006.01); E06B 7/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/231 (2013.01); E06B 3/302 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236857 A1 20020904; EP 1236857 B1 20040407; AT 263898 T 20040415

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080709

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060711

2005-07-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050722

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050719

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050628

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO EDER AG

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101905 P 20040513

2004-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2003-10-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR THE FABRICATION OF FRAMES FOR WINDOWS AND/OR DOORS AND A COVERING PROFILE WHICH IS EMPLOYED IN THIS METHOD

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI