Global Patent Index - EP 1236869 A1

EP 1236869 A1 2002-09-04 - Arrangement for introducing air-fuel mixture in a combustion chamber, in particular for a two-stroke engine

Title (en)

Arrangement for introducing air-fuel mixture in a combustion chamber, in particular for a two-stroke engine

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Einbringen des Kraftstoff-Luft-Gemisches in eine Brennkammer, insbesondere für eine Zweitaktbrennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour introduire un mélange carbure dans une chambre de combustion d'un moteur - combustion interne, notamment d'un moteur - deux temps

Publication

EP 1236869 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290344 A

Priority

FR 0102771 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2821387A1] The device for introducing pressurized fuel mixture into combustion chamber comprises a valve (38) for sealing a carbureted mixture pipe (40). An assistance part connected to the valve comprises a movable separation element (50) delimiting upper (54) and lower (56) chambers. There is a pressurized air supply channel (62) to one of the chambers and fluidic communication means (64) between the chambers. Thee communication means comprise a passage section reduction (70,72) for braking the pressurized air leaving one of the chambers.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un dispositif pour introduire sous pression un mélange carburé dans une chambre de combustion d'un cylindre d'un moteur à combustion interne, notamment d'un moteur à deux temps, comprenant une soupape (38) pour l'obturation d'une canalisation (40) d'introduction du mélange carburé, un organe d'assistance lié à ladite soupape et comprenant un élément mobile de séparation (50) délimitant une chambre supérieure (54) ainsi qu'une chambre inférieure (56), des moyens d'alimentation en air sous pression (62) de l'une des chambres et des moyens de communication fluidique (64) entre les chambres (54, 56). Selon l'invention, les moyens de communication comportent des moyens de freinage (70, 72) du déplacement de l'air sous pression sortant de l'une des chambres (54, 56). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/38 (2006.01); F01L 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236869 A1 20020904; FR 2821387 A1 20020830; FR 2821387 B1 20030502; JP 2002266609 A 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080902

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040504

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI