Global Patent Index - EP 1236871 A1

EP 1236871 A1 2002-09-04 - Device for inserting expanded fibres in a cavity or for laying on a surface

Title (en)

Device for inserting expanded fibres in a cavity or for laying on a surface

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Einziehen expandierter Fasern in einem Hohlraum oder zum Ablegen auf einer Oberfläche

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour insérer dans une cavité ou déposer sur une surface des fibres sous forme expansée

Publication

EP 1236871 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290279 A

Priority

FR 0102991 A

Abstract (en)

A device for spraying expanded fibres into or onto a receiving element comprises a rover (20) for a thread (21) of fibres and a fibre spray gun (30). Compressed air fed to the spray gun separates and tangles the thread of fibres in the nozzle and projects the expanded fibres via an extraction system. The spray gun is in the form of a portable tool provided with a grip (31) incorporating the extraction system. The expanded fibres are, for example, glass fibres. The device may also incorporate a decohesion system for the thread

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif pour loger dans ou sur un élément de réception des fibres sous forme expansée, par exemple des fibres de verre, comportant au moins un roving (20) d'au moins une mèche (21) de fibres, un appareil de projection des fibres (30) qui comprend au moins une entrée (32) pour la mèche (21) issue du roving, une sortie (34) telle qu'une buse pour la projection de la mèche sous forme expansée, et une arrivée d'alimentation en air (35) servant à la séparation et l'enchevêtrement des fibres dans la buse, la mèche (21) de roving étant dévidée jusqu'à l'appareil de projection (30) via un système d'extraction (33), caractérisé en ce que l'appareil de projection (30) se présente sous la forme d'un outil portatif pourvu d'un moyen de préhension (31), et comporte le système d'extraction (33). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 1/24; B65H 54/86; F01N 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/24 (2013.01); F01N 2310/02 (2013.01); F01N 2450/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4569471 A 19860211 - INGEMANSSON BENGT-ERIK [SE], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236871 A1 20020904; CA 2371331 A1 20020902; FR 2821574 A1 20020906; FR 2821574 B1 20031128; NO 20021032 D0 20020301; NO 20021032 L 20020903; US 2002121526 A1 20020905; US 6758998 B2 20040706

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050826

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030224

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI