Global Patent Index - EP 1236883 A2

EP 1236883 A2 2002-09-04 - Fuel system

Title (en)

Fuel system

Title (de)

Kraftstoffsystem

Title (fr)

Système de combustible

Publication

EP 1236883 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02251468 A

Priority

GB 0105193 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel system comprising a fuel injector (10) having a delivery chamber (22) which is arranged to receive fuel from a source (34) of high pressure fuel and from which fuel is delivered to a combustion space upon initiation of injection, comprising first and second control chambers (26, 44) for receiving a control fluid, a three way control valve arrangement (32) which is operable to control fluid pressure within the first control chamber (26) so as to control fuel injection timing, and to control fluid pressure within the second chamber (44), and a shut-off valve arrangement (46) operable in response to fluid pressure variations within the second control chamber (44) so as to control the flow of fuel between the source (34) of high pressure fuel and the delivery chamber (22) of the injector. The three way control valve arrangement (32) is actuable between a first position in which the first control chamber (26) communicates with a source (34; 61) of control fluid at relatively high pressure and a second position in which the first control chamber (26) communicates with a low pressure control fluid reservoir (38; 60). <??>The invention provides the advantage that leakage of fuel into the engine cylinder or other combustion space of the associated engine is reduced as the flow of high pressure fuel into the delivery chamber (22) is terminated between successive injections of fuel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0045 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4142739 A1 19930624 - WEDLER HARTMUT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236883 A2 20020904; EP 1236883 A3 20031126; GB 0105193 D0 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040527

2004-09-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI