Global Patent Index - EP 1236884 A2

EP 1236884 A2 2002-09-04 - Fuel injection device for internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Fuel injection device for internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection de combustible pour moteurs à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1236884 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02002233 A

Priority

DE 10109610 A

Abstract (en)

Fuel injection device for an internal combustion engine comprises a first electrically operated control valve (60) controlling at least indirectly a connection of the pump working chamber (22) with a discharge chamber (24), and a second electrically operated control valve (70) controlling the pressure in a pressure chamber (52) of the fuel injection valve (12) which impinges on the injection valve element (28) at least indirectly in the closing direction. The two control valves are arranged on the fuel injection valve. Preferred Features: The lead (14) leads into a valve body (26) of the fuel injection valve and branches into a line (54) leading into a pressure chamber (40) surrounding the injection valve element and into a line (55) leading to the control valves.

Abstract (de)

Die Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung weist eine Kraftstoffpumpe (10) für jeden Zylinder der Brennkraftmaschine auf, die einen durch die Brennkraftmaschine in einer Hubbewegung angetriebenen Pumpenkolben (18) aufweist, der einen Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) begrenzt, welcher über eine Leitung (14) mit einem getrennt von der Kraftstoffpumpe (10) an der Brennkraftmaschine angeordneten Kraftstoffeinspritzventil (12) verbunden ist, das ein Einspritzventilglied (28) aufweist, durch das wenigstens eine Einspritzöffnung (32) gesteuert wird und das durch den im Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) erzeugten Druck gegen eine Schließkraft in Öffnungsrichtung (29) bewegbar ist, wobei ein erstes elektrisch angesteuertes Steuerventil (60) vorgesehen ist, durch das eine Verbindung der Leitung (14) mit einem Entlastungsraum (24) gesteuert wird. Ein zweites elektrisch angesteuertes Steuerventil (64) ist vorgesehen, durch das der in einem Steuerdruckraum (52) des Kraftstoffeinspritzventils (12) herrschende Druck gesteuert wird, durch den das Einspritzventilglied (28) zumindest mittelbar in Schließrichtung beaufschlagt ist. Beide Steuerventile (60,70) sind am Kraftstoffeinspritzventil (12) angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/46; F02M 45/04; F02M 45/08; F02M 45/12; F02M 47/02; F02M 59/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/04 (2006.01); F02M 45/08 (2006.01); F02M 45/12 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/36 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0049 (2013.01); F02M 45/04 (2013.01); F02M 45/08 (2013.01); F02M 45/12 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 59/366 (2013.01); F02M 59/466 (2013.01); F02M 59/468 (2013.01); F02M 63/0017 (2013.01); F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); F02M 63/0061 (2013.01); F02M 2200/703 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0957261 A2 19991117 - LUCAS IND PLC [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236884 A2 20020904; EP 1236884 A3 20040107; EP 1236884 B1 20050406; DE 10109610 A1 20020905; US 2002152992 A1 20021024; US 6688289 B2 20040210

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070130

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080130

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080130

2008-09-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070118

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-01-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070124

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-01-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070123

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060110

2006-03-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060321

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-08-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050726

2005-07-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202677 P 20050512

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-04-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/46 A

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/36 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 47/02 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 45/04 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 45/08 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 45/12 B

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI