Global Patent Index - EP 1236885 A2

EP 1236885 A2 2002-09-04 - Fuel injection device for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel injection device for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection de carburant pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1236885 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02002432 A

Priority

  • DE 10109612 A
  • DE 10160256 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel injector for a motor vehicle engine has a control valve assembly (60) with at least two solenoid valves having a single actuator (64). Each valve (63,73) can move against a return drive between two positions. One valve is moved by the actuator and the other by movement of the first valve. The first valve has a fuel filled connecting chamber (71) with pressure varied by movement of the movement of the valve. Pressure variations in the chamber act on the second valve.

Abstract (de)

Die Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung weist eine Steuerventileinrichtung (60) mit wenigstens zwei elektrisch gesteuerten Steuerventilen (62,72) auf, die durch einen einzigen elektromagnetischen Aktor (64) gesteuert werden und die jeweils ein Steuerventilglied (63,73) aufweisen, das gegen eine Rückstellkraft zwischen wenigstens zwei Schaltstellungen bewegbar ist, wobei das Steuerventilglied (63) eines ersten Steuerventils (62) durch den Aktor (64) bewegbar ist und das Steuerventilglied (73) wenigstens eines zweiten Steuerventils (72) zumindest mittelbar durch das Steuerventilglied (63) des ersten Steuerventils (62) bewegbar ist. Durch das Steuerventilglied (63) des ersten Steuerventils (62) wird zumindest mittelbar ein kraftstoffgefüllter Koppelraum (71) begrenzt, wobei bei der Schaltbewegung des Steuerventilglieds (63) der Druck im Steuerdruckraum (71) verändert wird und das Steuerventilglied (73) des zweiten Steuerventils (72) zumindest mittelbar vom Druck im Koppelraum (71) beaufschlagt ist und durch die im Koppelraum (71) erfolgende Druckänderung zwischen seinen wenigstens zwei Schaltstellungen bewegbar ist. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 57/02; F02M 45/12; F02M 47/02; F02M 59/36; F02M 59/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/12 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 57/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/36 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/366 (2013.01); F02M 45/12 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 57/023 (2013.01); F02M 59/466 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0823549 A2 19980211 - LUCAS IND PLC [GB], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236885 A2 20020904; EP 1236885 A3 20040121; EP 1236885 B1 20050330

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2008-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050630

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-03-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060102

2006-02-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050718

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202599 P 20050504

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 57/02 A

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/46 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 47/02 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/36 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 45/12 B

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI