Global Patent Index - EP 1236890 A2

EP 1236890 A2 2002-09-04 - Inertia gear drive starter

Title (en)

Inertia gear drive starter

Title (de)

Brems-Schraubtrieb-Starter

Title (fr)

Démarreur à pignon baladeur

Publication

EP 1236890 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01129817 A

Priority

DE 10110074 A

Abstract (en)

Starter motor (2), for an internal combustion motor, has a drive shaft (3) with a coupled gearing (5) and preferably a planetary gear with a freewheel (11) and a coupled drive take-off shaft (12). A single-track gearing (17) to operate the starter pinion (16) is coupled to the take-off shaft, with a coarse screw thread (15), toothed brake disk (18) and brake lock (19). The brake lock is a bi stable brake rocker, automatically positioned between two end settings which give a locking and a release action, held in the end positions by a bi stable snap spring.

Abstract (de)

Ein Brems-Schraubtrieb-Starter zum Andrehen von Verbrennungsmaschinen umfaßt einen Startermotor (2) mit einer Antriebswelle (3), ein damit verbundenes Getriebe (5), vorzugsweise Planetengetriebe, mit Freilauf (11), eine mit dem Freilauf (11) gekoppelte Abtriebswelle (12), ein mit der Abtriebswelle (12) gekoppeltes Einspurgetriebe (17) mit Steilgewinde (15), Zahn-Bremsscheibe (18) und Brems-Sperrglied (19), sowie ein vom Einspurgetriebe betätigbares Starterritzel (16), wobei das Brems-Sperrglied (19) selbsttätig zwischen zwei bistabilen Endlagen, nämlich einer Freigabe-Endlage und einer Sperr-Endlage schaltbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 15/06; F02N 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/04 (2006.01); F02N 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/066 (2013.01); F02N 15/046 (2013.01); F02N 15/063 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2439981 A1 19760304 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236890 A2 20020904; EP 1236890 A3 20040317; DE 10110074 A1 20020905

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080103

2004-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02N 15/06 A

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02N 15/04 B

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI