Global Patent Index - EP 1236891 A2

EP 1236891 A2 2002-09-04 - Apparatus for diagnosing a spark ignition engine

Title (en)

Apparatus for diagnosing a spark ignition engine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Diagnose einer fremdgezündeten Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le diagnostic d'un moteur à allumage commandé

Publication

EP 1236891 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004575 A

Priority

DE 10110047 A

Abstract (en)

The diagnosis circuit is for a motor vehicle engine ignition. Each cylinder has a spark plug connected via a potential cut off diode (20) connected with the secondary winding (14) of the ignition coil (12). The voltage (UZ) applied to the plug is compared to a preset value (US) by a comparator (30). The switching signal (UK) is evaluated as a signal fed to the fuel injector adjacent to the plug. The spark position is compared to a preset crankshaft rotational position.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vorrichtung zur Diagnose einer fremdgezündeten Brennkraftmaschine vorgeschlagen. Die zur Entflammung eines in einen Zylinder der Brennkraftmaschine eingespritzen Kraftstoffs vorgesehene Zündkerze ist über eine potenzialtrennende Entkopplung (20) mit der Sekundärwicklung (14) der Zündspule (12) verbunden. Die an der Zündkerze (11) liegende Spannung (UZ) wird von einem Komparator (30) mit einem Schwellenwert (US) verglichen. Das Schaltsignal (UK) des Komparators (30) ist gewertet als ein Signal, das anzeigt, daß Kraftstoff nach dem Einspritzvorgang die Zündkerze (11) erreicht hat. Durch einen Vergleich mit bekannten Sollpositionen bezogen auf den Kurbelwellenwinkel oder bezogen auf Kurbelwellenwinkelbereiche ist eine Diganose möglich. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 17/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 17/12 (2013.01); F02P 2017/006 (2013.01); F02P 2017/121 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236891 A2 20020904; EP 1236891 A3 20050406; EP 1236891 B1 20060621; DE 10110047 A1 20020905; DE 50207241 D1 20060803

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070322

2006-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060925

2006-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207241 P 20060803

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-06-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2005-12-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-11-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-04-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI