Global Patent Index - EP 1236894 A1

EP 1236894 A1 2002-09-04 - Electromagnetically operated pump

Title (en)

Electromagnetically operated pump

Title (de)

Elektromagnetische Pumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe électromagnetique

Publication

EP 1236894 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02004696 A

Priority

IT MI20010419 A

Abstract (en)

An electromagnetically operated pump, to feed two-stroke internal-combustion engines with precise and controlled amounts of oil, comprises in a casing (1): a cylinder (2); a piston element (3) with a through pipe (4), axially movable in said cylinder (2); an electromagnetic coil (10) external to the cylinder (2), to control the movements of the piston element (3) against the action of spring means (11); a pumping and metering chamber (7) for the oil to be fed, at one end (9) of the cylinder (2); and valve means (12, 13) housed in said casing (1) close to said end (9), one of said means (12) cooperating with said piston element (3). According to the invention, two opposite abutments (14, 15) are formed on the piston element (3), said abutments (14, 15) cooperating with corresponding abutments (16, 17) of an element apt to stop the cylinder (2) into the casing (1). In said pump, the stroke (C) of the piston element (3) into the cylinder (2) is limited exclusively by the cooperation between said abutments (14, 15 and 16, 17) which thereby determine the metering of the oil to be fed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 17/04; F01M 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/02 (2006.01); F01M 3/02 (2006.01); F04B 17/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 3/02 (2013.01); F01M 1/02 (2013.01); F04B 17/046 (2013.01); F02B 2075/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236894 A1 20020904; EP 1236894 B1 20060628; DE 60212742 D1 20060810; DE 60212742 T2 20070628; ES 2263699 T3 20061216; IT MI20010419 A1 20020902

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-12-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60212742

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2013-07-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130708

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110210

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070329

2007-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2263699 T3

2006-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60212742 P 20060810

2006-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2006-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060628

2005-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050111

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI