Global Patent Index - EP 1236905 A2

EP 1236905 A2 2002-09-04 - Centrifugal pump, especially dredge pump

Title (en)

Centrifugal pump, especially dredge pump

Title (de)

Kreiselpumpe, insbesondere Baggerpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe centrifugale, en particulier pompe de drague

Publication

EP 1236905 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01115155 A

Priority

DE 10109094 A

Abstract (en)

Rotary pump, especially a dredging pump, for conveying a solid/water mixture comprises a pump housing having an axial suction inlet and a bearing opening on the opposite side, a drive shaft protruding via the bearing opening into the pump housing, and a pump gyroscope (10) arranged within the pump housing and consisting of two disks (12, 14) arranged a distance apart and blades (16) connected to the disks. The pump gyroscope is arranged on the end of the shaft so that it does not rotate using a hub section (20) attached to the disk on the bearing side. A deflecting section (32) made of a suitable plastic material or rubber lies between the hub section and the inner side of the disk on the bearing side. Preferred Features: The deflecting section is fixed using adhesive or screws (34) passing through the disk on the bearing side from the outside.

Abstract (de)

Kreiselpumpe, insbesondere Baggerpumpe zum Fördern eines Feststoff-Wasser-Gemisches, mit einem Pumpengehäuse mit einem axialen Saugeinlass und einer Lageröffnung auf der gegenüberliegenden Seite, einer Antriebswelle, die über die Lageröffnung in das Pumpengehäuse hineinsteht, einem innerhalb des Pumpengehäuses angeordneten Pumpenkreisel, der sich aus zwei beabstandeten Scheiben und zwischen den Scheiben angeordneten mit den Scheiben verbundenen Schaufeln zusammensetzt und der mittels eines an der lagerseitigen Scheibe angebrachten Nabenabschnitts drehfest auf dem Wellenende angeordnet ist und einem Umlenkabschnitt aus geeignetem Kunststoffmaterial oder Gummi zwischen Nabenabschnitt und Innenseite der lagerseitigen Scheibe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 7/04; F04D 29/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/2227 (2013.01); F04D 29/2222 (2013.01); F04D 29/2294 (2013.01); F05D 2300/43 (2013.01); F05D 2300/431 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236905 A2 20020904; EP 1236905 A3 20020918; DE 10109094 A1 20020905

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04D 7/04 A, 7F 04D 29/42 B, 7F 04D 29/22 B

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI