Global Patent Index - EP 1236907 A1

EP 1236907 A1 2002-09-04 - Blower with an integrated blower-drive

Title (en)

Blower with an integrated blower-drive

Title (de)

Gebläse mit integriertem Gebläse-Antrieb

Title (fr)

Soufflante avec un eintrainement de ventilateur integre

Publication

EP 1236907 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02003076 A

Priority

DE 10110400 A

Abstract (en)

Fan comprises a fan housing (3), and a rotating fan blade wheel consisting of a fan blade ring for producing an air stream and a turbine blade ring (2) driving the blade wheel and impinged upon by a pressure fluid (F). A feed channel (8) for the pressure fluid and several nozzles (9) for conveying the pressure fluid from the feed channel to the turbine blade ring are provided. The number of effective nozzles can be varied. Preferred Features: The nozzles are provided in a nozzle group covering only part of the turbine blade ring. The nozzle/nozzle group can be moved relative to the feed channel and the feed channel can be moved relative to the nozzle/nozzle group.

Abstract (de)

Ein drehbares Gebläse-Schaufelrad (10) eines Gebläses umfasst einen Gebläseschaufelkranz, der zum Erzeugen eines Luftstromes dient sowie einen Turbinenschaufelkranz (2), der zum Antrieb des Schaufelrades (10) dient und der mit einem Druckfluid (F) beaufschlagbar ist. Ein Gebläsegehäuse (3) umfasst einen Zuführkanal (8) für das Druckfluid (F) sowie mehrere Düsen (9) zum Weiterleiten des Druckfluids vom Zuführkanal (8) zum Turbinenschaufelkranz (2). Die Anzahl der wirksamen Düsen (9) ist variierbar. Zu diesem Zweck sind die Düsen (9) auf einem um die Gebläse-Achse (11) verschwenkbaren Stator-Ring (6) angeordnet. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 25/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 15/08 (2006.01); F04D 25/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/045 (2013.01); F01D 15/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236907 A1 20020904; CA 2374096 A1 20020903; DE 10110400 A1 20020912; US 2002122720 A1 20020905; US 6652225 B2 20031125

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-17 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081108

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI