Global Patent Index - EP 1236908 A2

EP 1236908 A2 2002-09-04 - Motorised fan for suction hoods

Title (en)

Motorised fan for suction hoods

Title (de)

Motorlüfter für Abzugshauben

Title (fr)

Motoventilateur pour hottes aspirantes

Publication

EP 1236908 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02004487 A

Priority

IT AN20010008 U

Abstract (en)

An air conveyor (1) for suction hoods consists of a pair of half-augers (A,B) which are in juxtaposition; a fan (D) with a transverse plate (C) and a double set of vanes (D1) which are each fixed to the plate (C) with their own attachment point (3) and placed in such a way as to define circular rings that project form the plate (C) bilaterally and coaxially with the rotational axis (4) of the fan (D); and a spring return motor (H), supported by one (A) of the half-augers (A,B), that sustain the fan's (D) plate (C) inside the conveyor (1). The plate (C) has a greater radius (5) than the radius (6) of the circular rings formed by the vanes (D1), in order to ensure that the air flows that are moving separately through the conveyor (1) do not come into contact with each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/42; F04D 25/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/16 (2006.01); F04D 29/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/283 (2013.01); F04D 17/162 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236908 A2 20020904; EP 1236908 A3 20030827; IT AN20010008 U1 20020902; IT AN20010008 V0 20010301

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080408

2007-12-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071127

2006-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-06-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 29/42 A

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 25/16 B

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 17/16 B

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 29/28 B

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 29/70 B

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI