Global Patent Index - EP 1236953 A1

EP 1236953 A1 2002-09-04 - Front part comprising at least an optical unit and means for generating an air flow therein, and motor vehicle including the same

Title (en)

Front part comprising at least an optical unit and means for generating an air flow therein, and motor vehicle including the same

Title (de)

Frontfahrzeugteil mit mindestens einer optischen Einheit sowie Vorrichtung zur Erzeugeng einer Luftströmung in dieser, und entsprechendes Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Bloc avant comprenant au moins un bloc optique et des moyens pour y créer un écoulement d'air, et véhicule automobile correspondant

Publication

EP 1236953 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290474 A

Priority

FR 0102754 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002121357A1] This front unit for a motor vehicle comprises: at least one optical unit (2) which comprises a casing (7) provided with inlet and outlet openings (12, 13) for a flow of air sweeping the inside of the casing, a heat exchanger 3, and a fan (4) for producing an airstream passing through the heat exchanger. The front unit comprises a duct (15), a first end (16) of which is connected to an opening (12) in the casing (7) of the optical unit (2) and a second end (19) of which is arranged in the vicinity of the fan (4) so that the fan produces the flow of air for sweeping the inside of the casing (7).

Abstract (fr)

Ce bloc avant pour véhicule automobile comprend : au moins un bloc optique (2) qui comporte un boîtier (7) muni d'ouvertures (12, 13) d'entrée et de sortie d'un écoulement d'air de balayage de l'intérieur du boîtier, un échangeur de chaleur (3), et un ventilateur (4) pour produire un flux d'air traversant l'échangeur de chaleur. Le bloc avant comprend un conduit (15) dont une première extrémité (16) est raccordée à une ouverture (12) du boîtier (7) du bloc optique (2) et dont une deuxième extrémité (19) est disposée au voisinage du ventilateur (4) pour qu'il produise l'écoulement d'air de balayage de l'intérieur du boîtier (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 1/06 (2006.01); F21V 31/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 45/33 (2018.01); F01P 1/06 (2013.01); F21S 45/30 (2018.01); F21S 45/43 (2018.01); F21S 45/60 (2018.01); F21V 29/67 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2779804 A1 19991217 - VALEO VISION [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236953 A1 20020904; FR 2821416 A1 20020830; FR 2821416 B1 20031010; US 2002121357 A1 20020905

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050217

2004-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FAURECIA BLOC AVANT

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030210

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI