Global Patent Index - EP 1236955 A3

EP 1236955 A3 2002-11-27 - Disengagement linkage mechanism of extinction device for burner

Title (en)

Disengagement linkage mechanism of extinction device for burner

Title (de)

Mechanismus zum Auslegen einer Brennerlöscheinrichtung

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de dégagement d'un dispositif d'extinction de brûleur

Publication

EP 1236955 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02090078 A

Priority

JP 2001054157 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1236955A2] An extinction device for a burner is so constructed that precision of the operation of the extinction device can be heightened even when a shape memory coiled spring (141) is used as a temperatura sensor. An extinction device comprises a swinging linkage (139) which is held free to rotate around a rotation center (145), a shape memory coiled spring (141) arranged, in an compressed condition, between the swinging linkage (139) and a second base (145b) provided on a frame (101) to generate a spring force to rotate the swinging linkage (139) in one direction around a rotation center (145), and a bias spring (143) arranged, in an expanded condition, between the swinging linkage (139) and a second fixed portion of the frame (101) to generate a spring force to rotate the swinging linkage (139) in the other direction around the rotation center (145). Such a spring is used for a shape memory coiled spring (141). The coiled spring (141) has a characteristic to give, to the swinging linkage, a torque larger than a torque given a spring force of a bias spring 143, when the circumference temperature exceeds a predetermined level. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 25/00 (2006.01); A62C 37/16 (2006.01); F23D 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 37/16 (2013.01); F23D 3/18 (2013.01); F23D 2209/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [AD] US 5413479 A 19950509 - NAKANISHI YUTAKA [JP], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 006 (M - 1537) 7 January 1994 (1994-01-07)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 183 (M - 400) 30 July 1985 (1985-07-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 067 (M - 366) 27 March 1985 (1985-03-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236955 A2 20020904; EP 1236955 A3 20021127; EP 1236955 B1 20061129; AT 347071 T 20061215; CN 1283331 C 20061108; CN 1374141 A 20021016; ES 2277984 T3 20070801; KR 20020070889 A 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2009-05-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080228

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080227

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TOYOTOMI CO., LTD.

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070219

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2277984 T3

2007-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-02-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070219

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-02-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070216

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-02-01 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070201

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE ES FR NL

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050304

2003-09-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE ES FR NL

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020910

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI