Global Patent Index - EP 1236956 A1

EP 1236956 A1 2002-09-04 - Pot type oil burner

Title (en)

Pot type oil burner

Title (de)

Oeltopfbrenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur à huile du type à pot

Publication

EP 1236956 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01105019 A

Priority

EP 01105019 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a structure in which an unburnt gas can be prevented from being diffused into a room while suppressing the generation of the unburnt gas during the extinction operation of a pot type oil burner. During the extinction operation, first of all, the supply of a fuel from fuel feeding means (35) to a pot (15) is stopped and conduction to an electric heater (31) is started. The rotation of each of a combustion fan (23) and a convection fan (11) is carried out continuously. While a second timer (67) counts a second time period, the convection fan (11) is rotated at a high speed. After the second time period is ended, the rotation of the convection fan (11) is switched from high speed rotation into low speed rotation. The low speed rotation is carried out continuously for a third time period counted by a third timer. After the third time period is ended, the rotation of the convection fan (11) is returned from the low speed rotation to the high speed rotation. During the low speed rotation, an unburnt gas discharged from an air outlet (3) of a frame body (1) to the outside is raised to a ceiling portion with a natural convection so that the diffusion of the unburnt gas can be suppressed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 5/04; F23C 7/00; F23D 5/18; F23N 3/08; F23N 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23D 5/04 (2006.01); F23D 5/18 (2006.01); F23N 3/08 (2006.01); F23N 5/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 5/18 (2013.01); F23C 7/008 (2013.01); F23D 5/045 (2013.01); F23N 3/082 (2013.01); F23N 5/203 (2013.01); F23N 2027/06 (2013.01); F23N 2033/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236956 A1 20020904; EP 1236956 B1 20060301; ES 2259632 T3 20061016

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180313

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2259632 T3

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR IT NL

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR IT NL

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010906

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI