Global Patent Index - EP 1236957 A3

EP 1236957 A3 2002-12-04 - Process and device for adapting a burner-activated heating apparatus to an air-flue gas system

Title (en)

Process and device for adapting a burner-activated heating apparatus to an air-flue gas system

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Anpassung eines brennerbetriebenen Heizgerätes an ein Luft-Abgas-System

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'adaptation d'un appareil de chauffage à brûleur à un système d'évacuation d'air/de gaz brûlés

Publication

EP 1236957 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01123490 A

Priority

DE 10109808 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1236957A2] Process for adapting a burner-operated heating device to an air/exhaust gas system containing a burner (10), an air feed (14), an exhaust gas removal system (16), a fan (26), and a regulating device (30) regulating the fan to produce an air flow volume required for a specific burner output comprises measuring an instantaneous air volume flow in the air/exhaust gas system and adjusting it to the required air volume flow. An Independent claim is also included for a device for carrying out the above process. Preferred Features: The instantaneous air volume flow is recorded as pressure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 3/08; F23N 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23L 17/00 (2006.01); F23N 1/06 (2006.01); F23N 5/18 (2006.01); F23N 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23L 17/005 (2013.01); F23N 1/062 (2013.01); F23N 5/184 (2013.01); F23N 1/02 (2013.01); F23N 2005/181 (2013.01); F23N 2025/18 (2013.01); F23N 2033/04 (2013.01); F23N 2035/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236957 A2 20020904; EP 1236957 A3 20021204; EP 1236957 B1 20061102; DE 10109808 A1 20020912; DE 10109808 C2 20031204; DE 50111359 D1 20061214

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140928

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140928

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50111359

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140928

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50111359

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130920

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-05-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070213

2006-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50111359 P 20061214

2006-11-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 23N 3/08 A, 7F 23N 1/06 B

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI