Global Patent Index - EP 1236963 A2

EP 1236963 A2 2002-09-04 - Heat recuperator with extractable exchanger unit

Title (en)

Heat recuperator with extractable exchanger unit

Title (de)

Wärmerekuperator mit herausziehbarem Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Récupérateur de chaleur avec échangeur de chaleur amovible

Publication

EP 1236963 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02075735 A

Priority

IT MI20010109 U

Abstract (en)

The heat recuperator comprises an exchanger unit (3) housed inside a casing (1) provided with openings (2) for the intake and the output of flows of air subject to heat exchange. The casing (1) has an opening (6) with removable cover (7) and the heat exchanger unit (3) is coupled to the casing (1) by means of sliding guides (5) that allow its extraction through said opening (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/00; F24F 13/30; F28G 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236963 A2 20020904; EP 1236963 A3 20030813; IT MI20010109 U1 20020902; IT MI20010109 V0 20010301

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040214

2004-06-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI