Global Patent Index - EP 1236964 A1

EP 1236964 A1 2002-09-04 - Light firearm simulator and its simulating system

Title (en)

Light firearm simulator and its simulating system

Title (de)

Simulator von leichten Feuerwaffen und sein Simulationssystem

Title (fr)

Simulateur d'arme legere de tir et systeme de simulation de tir

Publication

EP 1236964 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02352004 A

Priority

FR 0102755 A

Abstract (en)

The firing weapon simulator comprises a movable release part (107) and a mechanical energy source able to move the release part from an armed position to a firing position. There are release part locking means in the armed position and firing trigger (105) connected to locking means by firing control transmission means, following the activating of trigger, to act on the locking means so as to free the release part. The simulator includes non-mechanical detection means (109,111) of the position of the release part and control means (126) of the firing production means slaved to the detection means so as to be able to release a simulated firing when the release part arrives in the shot commencement as detected by the detection means.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un simulateur d'arme légère de tir comprenant des moyens de production d'un tir simulé, un organe déclencheur mobile (107), une source d'énergie mécanique apte à mouvoir l'organe déclencheur depuis une position armée vers une position de tir, des moyens de blocage de l'organe déclencheur en position armée, des moyens (105) de commande de tir par un utilisateur, reliés aux moyens de blocage par des moyens de transmission de la commande de tir adaptés pour, suite à l'actionnement des moyens (105) de commande de tir, agir sur les moyens de blocage de façon à libérer l'organe déclencheur, ledit simulateur étant caractérisé en ce qu'il comprend des moyens non mécaniques de détection (109, 111) d'au moins une position de l'organe déclencheur (107), dite position de départ de coup, et des moyens (126) de contrôle des moyens de production de tir asservis auxdits moyens (109, 111) de détection de façon à pouvoir déclencher un tir simulé lorsque l'organe déclencheur (107) arrive en position de départ de coup telle que détectée par les moyens (109, 111) de détection. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 33/02; F41A 33/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 33/02 (2006.01); F41A 33/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 33/02 (2013.01); F41A 33/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236964 A1 20020904; FR 2821418 A1 20020830; FR 2821418 B1 20030912

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050913

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050301

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030110

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI