Global Patent Index - EP 1236966 A1

EP 1236966 A1 2002-09-04 - Control of the velocity of an airborne weapon

Title (en)

Control of the velocity of an airborne weapon

Title (de)

Steuerung der Geschwindigkeit einer luftgetragenen Waffe

Title (fr)

Contrôle de la vitesse d'une arme aéroportée

Publication

EP 1236966 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290491 A

Priority

FR 0102875 A

Abstract (en)

The speed control for an air launched munition (100) involves altering the flight path of the munition to increase its incidence (200) and thus increase its drag to provide a braking effect. The method involves having the munition make a series of movements away from the path followed by return movements. The method can also involve rotating the munition. An Independent claim is included for a missile using the above speed control method.

Abstract (fr)

Procédé de contrôle de la vitesse d'une arme (100) aéroportée, caractérisé en ce qu'on contrôle la vitesse de l'arme en faisant effectuer à celle-ci autour d'une trajectoire moyenne souhaitée une succession de manoeuvres qui augmentent sa traînée par prise d'incidence et la freinent. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 10/48; F42B 10/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/48 (2006.01); F42B 10/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/64 (2013.01); F42B 10/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236966 A1 20020904; FR 2821667 A1 20020906; FR 2821667 B1 20030829; ZA 200201732 B 20070425

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROUCOUX, BERTRAND

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MATHIEU, BENOIT

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI