Global Patent Index - EP 1237049 A2

EP 1237049 A2 2002-09-04 - Automatic device for cleaning corona wires

Title (en)

Automatic device for cleaning corona wires

Title (de)

Automatische Vorrichtung zum Reinigen von Koronadrähten

Title (fr)

Dispositif automatique de nettoyage de fils corona

Publication

EP 1237049 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004188 A

Priority

US 79632101 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2373984A1] A mechanism for automatically cleaning the surface of a corona wire within a corona charger is described, wherein the a cleaning assembly includ es a cleaning pad mounted within a pad holder, the cleaning pad wrapped around a substantial portion of a circumference of the corona wire for wiping the surface of the corona wire. The cleaning mechanism also includes means for holding the cleaning assembly within the corona charger in association with the corona wire, means, associated with the holding means, for moving the holding means linearly along the length of the corona wire, and means for automatically selectively activating the moving means to move the holding means such that the cleaning assembly is moved to clean the corona wire. In one embodiment, the cleaning assembly includes at least one finishing stone mounted to a stone holder, wherein the finishing stone engages the surface of the corona wire.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum automatischen Reinigen der Oberfläche eines Koronadrahtes (14) in einem Koronalader (10) umfasst eine Reinigungsvorrichtung (40) mit einer Reinigungsauflage (50), die in dem Auflagehalter (43) befestigt ist, wobei die Reinigungsauflage (50) um einen wesentlichen Teil des Umfangs des Koronadrahtes (14) gewickelt ist, um die Oberfläche des Koronadrahtes (14) zu reinigen. Die Reinigungsvorrichtung (40) umfasst auch Mittel zum Halten der Reinigungsanordnung (42; 152) in Verbindung mit dem Koronadraht (14) in dem Koronalader (10), Mittel, die mit den Haltemittel (44) verbunden sind, zum Bewegen der Haltemittel (44) entlang des Koronadrahtes (14) sowie Mittel zum automatischen wahlweisen Aktivieren der Bewegungsmittel, um die Haltemittel (44) so zu bewegen, dass die Reinigungsanordnung (42; 152) bewegt wird, um den Koronadraht (14) zu reinigen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/023 (2006.01); G03G 15/02 (2006.01); H01T 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/0258 (2013.01); G03G 15/0291 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1237049 A2 20020904; EP 1237049 A3 20050309; CA 2373984 A1 20020828; CA 2373984 C 20050927; DE 10208022 A1 20020905; JP 2002268342 A 20020918; US 2002118979 A1 20020829; US 2003180065 A1 20030925; US 6580885 B2 20030617; US 6868242 B2 20050315

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050910

2006-01-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-11-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-03-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI