Global Patent Index - EP 1237058 A1

EP 1237058 A1 2002-09-04 - Usage of a non-magnetic coating for covering parts in a horological movement

Title (en)

Usage of a non-magnetic coating for covering parts in a horological movement

Title (de)

Benutzung einer nichtmagnetischen Schicht zum Abdecken von Teilen in einem Uhrengangwerk

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'un revêtement amagnétique pour recouvrir des pièces dans un mouvement d'horlogerie

Publication

EP 1237058 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01200752 A

Priority

EP 01200752 A

Abstract (en)

The micro-generator (1) includes magnetic parts (5) and is partially surrounded by non magnetic parts (11,12) covered by a finishing cover. The finishing cover covering the rough finish parts (11,12) situated in proximity to the micro-generator has essentially non-magnetic properties. The covering includes at least two metallic layers, and at least those in contact with the parts (11,12) contains nickel forming part of a non-magnetic alloy. The micro-generator (1) has a rotor (2) including two disk flanges (3). Each disk has on its face opposite the other a number of magnets (5). The micro-generator has also an electronic module (6) including at least a stator winding (4) partially inserted between the two disk flanges (3). The generator is partially situated in a volume delimited by the orthogonal projections from the parts (11,12). The generator detects the presence of an external magnetic field and assures the operation of a compass.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention propose d'améliorer le rendement d'une microgénératrice (1) servant au fonctionnement d'une pièce d'horlogerie. Une telle microgénératrice fonctionne sur la base du phénomène d'induction électromagnétique, il est donc souhaitable de limiter autant que possible la présence à proximité de ladite génératrice de masses magnétiques. Or, les recherches effectuées ont révélé que le revêtement de finition recouvrant les parties de l'ébauche (11, 12) disposées à proximité de la microgénératrice freine cette dernière lorsqu'il est réalisé en un matériau magnétique, et en particulier ferromagnétique. Ainsi, il est proposé de sélectionner, pour la fabrication de l'ébauche et de son revêtement, exclusivement des matériaux amagnétiques. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04C 3/00 (2006.01); G04C 10/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04C 10/00 (2013.01); G04C 3/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1237058 A1 20020904; AT 282844 T 20041215; CN 1252549 C 20060419; CN 1498362 A 20040519; DE 60201978 D1 20041223; DE 60201978 T2 20051215; EP 1366391 A1 20031203; EP 1366391 B1 20041117; HK 1064452 A1 20061124; JP 2004521340 A 20040715; US 2004042349 A1 20040304; US 2007025188 A1 20070201; WO 02071159 A1 20020912

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ETA SA MANUFACTURE HORLOGERE SUISSE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI