Global Patent Index - EP 1237083 A3

EP 1237083 A3 2007-10-17 - System and method for accessing functionality of a backend system from an application server

Title (en)

System and method for accessing functionality of a backend system from an application server

Title (de)

System und Verfahren zum Zugriff auf die Funktionalität eines Backend-Systems von einem Anwendungsserver

Title (fr)

Système et procédé pour accéder à la fonctionnalité d'un système secondaire depuis un serveur d'applications

Publication

EP 1237083 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02251379 A

Priority

US 79281001 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1237083A2] A system and method for automatically creating information useable to access functionality of a backend computer system coupled to an application server. The method may operate to connect to the backend computer system and obtain information specifying functionality of the backend system. The information obtained may be analyzed programmatically, and new information may be programmatically created based on the analysis, wherein the programmatically created information is useable for accessing the functionality of the backend system. For example, where the functionality comprises a programmatically callable function, the information created may include information specifying the function name, names of input and output parameters, data types of the parameters, etc. The programmatically created information may be stored in a repository for use in accessing the functionality of the backend computer system from the application server. For example, the information may be retrieved from the repository and used to programmatically construct appropriate data structures and/or execute appropriate code for interfacing with the backend system to access the desired functionality.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/5055 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 0077635 A1 20001221 - SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]
  • [A] US 5341477 A 19940823 - PITKIN RICHARD P [US], et al
  • [A] US 5905856 A 19990518 - OTTENSOOSER AVNER BENJAMIN [AU]
  • [A] "Jini (TM) Architectural Overview", INTERNET CITATION, January 1999 (1999-01-01), XP002152110, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:www.sun.com/jini/witepapers/architecture.pdf> [retrieved on 20001107]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1237083 A2 20020904; EP 1237083 A3 20071017; US 2002120787 A1 20020829; US 6978461 B2 20051220

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080418

2008-08-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHAPIRO, ARI

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EFRACH, MIRIAM

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI