Global Patent Index - EP 1237127 A1

EP 1237127 A1 2002-09-04 - Method and apparatus for carrying out an acceptability check in an automatic banknote machine

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for carrying out an acceptability check in an automatic banknote machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung einer Akzeptanzprüfung bei einer automatisierten Banknotenmaschine

Title (fr)

Procede et dispositif pour effectuer un test d'acceptabilité dans une machine des billets de banque

Publication

EP 1237127 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01104661 A

Priority

EP 01104661 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002118872A1] In order to provide a procedure and a device that will enable the, at least partially, automated acceptance of bank notes that can be realized in an acceptable cost range and that will enable the highly automated, rapid acceptance of bank notes with a high level of certainty, a method, in which a test for the acceptability of bank notes is performed by automatic vending machines is proposed; by this method a bank note is fed via a transport unit to a digitalization station, where it is at least partially digitized; the data obtained in this manner are then compared with stored data by a computer unit, which makes a determination of value, and renders an automatic decision regarding acceptance. If the automatic decision regarding acceptance is negative, an image of the digitized data is generated in order to allow a service employee to perform a visual inspection of the note and render a final decision regarding acceptance.

Abstract (de)

Um ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur wenigstens teilweise automatisierten Annahme von Banknoten bereitzustellen, welche mit wirtschaftlich vertretbarem Aufwand realisierbar sind und bei geringem Zeitverbrauch und auf hohem Sicherheitsniveau eine weitestgehend automatisierte Banknotenannahme ermöglichen, wird vorgeschlagen ein Verfahren zur Durchführung einer Akzeptanzprüfung bei der Annahme von Banknoten mittels Automaten, wobei eine Banknote mittels einer Zuführeinheit einer Digitalisierungsstation zugeführt und zumindest teilweise digitalisiert wird, mittels einer Rechnereinheit die erhaltenen Daten mit gespeicherten Daten verglichen werden, um einerseits eine Wertermittlung durchzuführen und andererseits eine automatische Akzeptanzentscheidung herbeizuführen, wobei im Falle einer negativen automatischen Akzeptanzentscheidung zum Zwecke einer abschließenden Akzeptanzentscheidung aufgrund optischer Prüfung durch eine Bedienperson eine Bilddarstellung der digitalisierten Daten erzeugt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/00 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1237127 A1 20020904; US 2002118872 A1 20020829; US 7034323 B2 20060425

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130903

2006-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060720

2003-07-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB IE

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): GB IE

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI