Global Patent Index - EP 1237146 A1

EP 1237146 A1 2002-09-04 - Clamp for fixing a pedal device to a bass-drum

Title (en)

Clamp for fixing a pedal device to a bass-drum

Title (de)

Spannklaue zur Befestigung einer Fussmaschine an einer Bass-Drum

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour fixer la pédale sur une grosse caise

Publication

EP 1237146 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02004448 A

Priority

DE 10109945 A

Abstract (en)

Clamping claw for connecting a foot machine (1) of a percussion instrument to a section of a circular clamping collar (23) of the percussion instrument, especially a bass drum, comprises a clamp having a first part (24), a second part (25), and devices for tightening/untightening the first and the second part. Compared with the second part lying on the outer side of the clamping collar, the first part lying on the inner side of the clamping collar has inwardly offset contact points for placing on the clamping collar. An Independent claim is also included for a foot machine for fixing onto a clamping collar of a percussion instrument using a clamping claw. Preferred Features: Compared with the second part, the first part has a shorter geometrical extension along the clamping collar.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Spannklaue zur Verbindung einer Fußmaschine (1) für Perkussions-Instrumente mit einem Abschnitt eines kreisförmigen Spannreifens (23) eines Perkussions-Instrumentes, insbesondere einer Bass-Drum (9), sowie eine entsprechende Fußmaschine. Die Spannklaue, die eine Klammer (26) mit einem ersten Teil (24), einem zweiten Teil (25) sowie Mitteln zum Verspannen und Entspannen des ersten (24) und zweiten Teils (25) gegeneinander umfaßt, ist so ausgebildet, daß der erste Teil (24), der an die Innenseite des Spannreifens (23) angreift, gegenüber dem zweiten Teil (25), der an die Außenseite des Spannreifens (23) angreift, nach innen versetzt angeordnete Berührungspunkte zum Aufliegen auf dem Spannreifen aufweist. Mittels dieser Anordnung wird eine Spannklaue geschaffen, die bei der Montage und in der Klammerstellung den Spannreifen, der häufig aus empfindlichen Hölzern besteht, nicht beschädigt. Zudem wird eine Fußmaschine vorgeschlagen, die mit der Spannklaue verbunden wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10D 13/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1237146 A1 20020904; EP 1237146 B1 20060705; DE 10109945 A1 20020919; DE 50207414 D1 20060817; US 2002121178 A1 20020905; US 6632990 B2 20031014

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090227

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100227

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100227

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080214

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070410

2007-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061009

2006-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207414 P 20060817

2006-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-07-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060705

2005-06-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050513

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030220

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI