Global Patent Index - EP 1237163 A2

EP 1237163 A2 2002-09-04 - Covering for any kind of cable to protect against animals and insects.

Title (en)

Covering for any kind of cable to protect against animals and insects.

Title (de)

Ummantelung für Kabel aller Art zum Schutz gegen Tiere und Insekten

Title (fr)

Gaine pour câbles de tout type pour protéger contre des animaux et des insectes

Publication

EP 1237163 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02380048 A

Priority

ES 200100477 A

Abstract (en)

"COVERING FOR ANY KIND OF CABLE TO PROTECT AGAINST ANIMALS AND INSECTS", characterised essentially by the placement, on a traditional cable (1), of a cover or mesh made from conductive material (2), which will be connected permanently to a power supply (3), battery, cell or network, supplying a voltage throughout the length of the cable; and the provision, around the conductive cover (2), of an insulating cover and, optionally, an additional insulating cover (5) located between the sheath of the cable (1) and the conductive cover (2), which absorbs the effects of the latter on the data or energy being transmitted by the cable. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/1805 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1237163 A2 20020904; EP 1237163 A3 20030917; EP 1237163 A8 20030416; ES 2178596 A1 20021216; ES 2178596 B1 20041001

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OPTRAL, S.A.

2003-04-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ORTEGA PUIGORIOL, JUAN MANUEL

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI