Global Patent Index - EP 1237169 A1

EP 1237169 A1 2002-09-04 - High voltage circuir breaker with spring actuator with an additional energy recuperating spring

Title (en)

High voltage circuir breaker with spring actuator with an additional energy recuperating spring

Title (de)

Hochspannungsschalter mit Federsteuerung und Zusatzfeder für Energie-Rückgewinnung

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur à haute tension ayant une commande à ressorts avec un ressort additionnel de récuperation d'énergie

Publication

EP 1237169 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290446 A

Priority

FR 0102784 A

Abstract (en)

The circuit breaker has a chamber (1) with a moving contact driven by a spring control (3) opening or closing the switch. A first spring (7) opens the contact, whilst a second spring (10) closes the contact arming the first spring. There is an additional spring (20) providing a supplementary opening force. The additional spring has an inverter activated before the end of the opening cycle, opposing contact movement and storing energy in the spring for the next cycle.

Abstract (fr)

Le disjoncteur comprend une chambre de coupure (1) avec au moins un contact mobile (2) qui est actionné au moyen d'une commande mécanique à ressorts (3) pour ouvrir ou fermer le disjoncteur. La commande inclut au moins un premier ressort (7) exerçant une force tendant à déplacer le contact mobile pour ouvrir le disjoncteur et un second ressort (10) exerçant une force tendant à déplacer le contact mobile pour fermer le disjoncteur tout en armant le premier ressort. Un ressort additionnel (20) est prévu pour exercer une force supplémentaire dont la résultante se cumule à celle de la force exercée par le premier ressort (7) au début de l'ouverture du disjoncteur. Le ressort additionnel (20) est monté de telle façon qu'avant la fin de l'ouverture du disjoncteur, la résultante de la force qu'il exerce s'inverse pour s'opposer au déplacement du contact mobile. Le ressort additionnel (20) accumule ainsi une partie de l'énergie cinétique du contact mobile en fin d'ouverture. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/30 (2013.01); H01H 2003/3084 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1237169 A1 20020904; EP 1237169 B1 20100407; DE 60235855 D1 20100520; FR 2821696 A1 20020906; FR 2821696 B1 20030425; US 2002121503 A1 20020905; US 6667452 B2 20031223

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AREVA T&D SAS, FR

2013-08-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD, CH

- Effective date: 20130710

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM GRID SAS, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60235855

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60235855

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER, DE

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60235855

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER PATENTANWAELTE PAR, DE

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60235855

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER PATENT- UND RECHTS, DE

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-06-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60235855

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER, DE

2013-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM GRID SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AREVA T&D SAS, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60235855

- Effective date: 20130225

2013-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AREVA T&D SAS, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60235855

- Effective date: 20130225

2013-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60235855

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER, DE

- Effective date: 20130225

2013-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60235855

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER PATENTANWAELTE PAR, DE

- Effective date: 20130225

2013-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60235855

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER PATENT- UND RECHTS, DE

- Effective date: 20130225

2013-01-04 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20121204

2013-01-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ALSTOM GRID SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20121204

2011-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110110

2010-06-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2010-05-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60235855 P 20100520

2010-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

2009-12-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AREVA T&D SAS

2009-11-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AREVA T&D SAS

2006-01-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AREVA T&D SA

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI