Global Patent Index - EP 1237171 A2

EP 1237171 A2 2002-09-04 - Selective tripping system

Title (en)

Selective tripping system

Title (de)

Anordnug zur selektiven Auslösung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le déclenchement sélectif

Publication

EP 1237171 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02003395 A

Priority

DE 10109951 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has an electromagnetic short circuit trigger (4) per main currant path with a spring loaded hinged armature (11) in contact with a setting element (4) for all main current paths when at rest and attracted by a magnet yoke (12) carrying current in the short circuit case. A contact element (14) for outputting the blocking signal arranged between the armature and the yoke is changed from open to closed by the attracting armature. The arrangement has an actuating mechanism with a latching device, whereby a switch subject to a short circuit delivers a blocking signal to the actuating mechanism or triggering system of the preceding switch. An electromagnetic short circuit trigger (4) is provided for each main currant path with its spring loaded hinged armature (11) in contact with a setting element (4) for all main current paths when at rest and attracted by a magnet yoke (12) carrying current in the short circuit case. A contact element (14) for outputting the blocking signal arranged between the armature and the yoke is changed from open to closed by the attracting armature.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Anordnung zur selektiven Auslösung von hintereinander geschalteten, selektiv gestaffelten Schutzschaltern mit einem eine Verklinkungseinrichtung enthaltenden Betätigungsmechanismus, wobei ein vom Kurzschluss direkt betroffener Schutzschalter ein Blockiersignal an den Betätigungsmechanismus bzw. das Auslösesystem des vorgeschalteten Schutzschalters ausgibt. Das zu lösende Problem besteht in einer von Vorgängen im Kontaktraum des Schutzschalters unabhängigen und unaufwendigen Erzeugung eines Blockiersignals. Dazu ist für jede Hauptstrombahn ein elektromagnetischer Kurzschlussauslöser (10) vorgesehen, zwischen dessen federbeaufschlagten Klappanker (11) und dem Magnetjoch (12) ein mit Signalanschlüssen (7, 8) zur Ausgabe des Blockiersignals verbundenes Kontaktelement (14) ausgebildet ist, das durch den anziehenden Klappanker (11) vom geöffneten in den geschlossenen Zustand überführbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/10; H01H 71/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/10 (2006.01); H01H 71/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/46 (2013.01); H01H 71/1081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1237171 A2 20020904; EP 1237171 A3 20040317; EP 1237171 B1 20060607; DE 10109951 A1 20020905; DE 50207049 D1 20060720

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-01-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50207049

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100214

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090223

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070308

2007-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207049 P 20060720

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2006-06-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060607

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050330

2004-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI