Global Patent Index - EP 1237224 A1

EP 1237224 A1 2002-09-04 - Antenna and method for fabricating same

Title (en)

Antenna and method for fabricating same

Title (de)

Antenne und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung

Title (fr)

Antenne et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1237224 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02090048 A

Priority

DE 10108859 A

Abstract (en)

An antenna (2) has a combined antenna structure in which at least one loop antenna structure (10) is combined with at least one rod antenna structure (13). The combined antenna structure has a loop antenna structure (10) specifically in the frequency band with the lowest frequency.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Antenne, insbesondere eine integrierbare Multiband-Antenne für Mobilfunkgeräte, mit einer kombinierten Antennenstruktur, wobei mindestens eine Loop-Antennenstruktur mit mindestens einer Stab-Antennenstruktur kombiniert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/24; H01Q 1/36; H01Q 1/38; H01Q 5/00; H01Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/38 (2006.01); H01Q 5/357 (2015.01); H01Q 7/00 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/0421 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 1/38 (2013.01); H01Q 5/357 (2013.01); H01Q 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1237224 A1 20020904; DE 10108859 A1 20030522

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030523

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030407

2003-06-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI