Global Patent Index - EP 1237394 A1

EP 1237394 A1 2002-09-04 - Magnetic circuit for electrodynamic loudspeaker

Title (en)

Magnetic circuit for electrodynamic loudspeaker

Title (de)

Magnetkreisanordnung für elektrodynamischen Lautsprecher

Title (fr)

Circuit magnétique pour haut-parleur éléctrodynamique

Publication

EP 1237394 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290406 A

Priority

FR 0102807 A

Abstract (en)

The electrodynamic loudspeaker magnetic circuit (1.1) has a basin shaped body (2.1) and a cylindrical center section (9.1). There is a magnetic section (14) with a diameter (8.1) larger than the cylindrical center section. The effect of having the magnetic overlap sections is to limit the movement of the cylindrical center section.

Abstract (fr)

Circuit magnétique pour haut-parleur électrodynamique. Selon l'invention, ce circuit magnétique, du type connu à aimant central, est tel que le diamètre dudit aimant central 8.1 est plus grand que celui du noyau 9.1, de sorte que ledit aimant 8.1 présente une saillie périphérique 14, annulaire et radiale, par rapport au noyau 9.1. On améliore ainsi les performances dudit aimant magnétique. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0685983 A2 19951206 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]
  • [A] US 5157731 A 19921020 - MITOBE KUNIO [JP]
  • [XAY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 15 6 April 2001 (2001-04-06)
  • [XAY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 252 (E - 0934) 30 May 1990 (1990-05-30)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 044 (E - 1312) 27 January 1993 (1993-01-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1237394 A1 20020904; FR 2821710 A1 20020906; FR 2821710 B1 20030627; US 2002122558 A1 20020905

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080901

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070518

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI